pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


AL HIKMAH TRUST
CC40124
9429043091362
Registered

Registration details

17/05/2009
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 27176
Mount Roskill
Auckland
1440
Floor 11
300 Queen Street
Auckland Central
Auckland
1010

Charity's other details

0211340501

Asia

Malaysia, Saudi Arabia, United Arab Emirates


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide support services to Muslims and non-Muslims focussing particularly on the student population and those interested in learning about Islam.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Provides Chaplaincy Services,

Religious activities

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Community development, Social services, Sport / recreation, International activities, Fund-raising

Children / young people

Other charities, General public, Religious groups, Muslim and Non Muslim Tertiary Students

Entity Structure

3 Trustees provide services and management support to numerous volunteers and contractors.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2020 - - - - To be filed
30/09/2019 22/09/2019 $235,906 $134,848
30/09/2018 12/08/2018 $307,441 $121,161
30/09/2017 20/08/2018 $198,168 $148,919
30/09/2016 24/10/2016 $161,549 $113,844
30/09/2015 21/08/2015 $154,385 $83,857
30/09/2014 24/08/2014 $130,619 $95,739
30/09/2013 29/10/2013 $144,258 $96,166
30/09/2012 27/09/2012 $133,060 $83,282
30/09/2011 27/09/2011 $110,804 $62,146

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Sameer Youssef Committee Member 30/10/2009
Rafat Najm Trustee 14/10/2008
Tahira Yasmin Malik Trustee 14/10/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Alhussain Aldabbagh Committee Member 1/01/2012
Mohamed Abdelhady Trustee 1/01/2012
Riaz Buksh Trustee 29/01/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
27/09/2011 AR003
28/09/2010 AR002
28/06/2010 NOC002

Charity Documents