pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Akaroa Resource Collective Trust
Akaroa Heartlands
CC39088
9429043011889
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 52
Akaroa
7542
39 Rue Lavaud
Akaroa
7520

Charity's other details

03 304 8659
03 304 8659


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The purpose of the Trust is to provide, promote and support charitable services that are beneficial to the Community within Akaroa and surrounding areas and in particular to provide, promote and support services in respect of the following; Employment Initiatives, Aged People Welfare, Youth Activiites & Initiatives with emphasis on the needs of youth who are at risk, Artistic and Cultural Education, Enviornmental Concerns. Also providing advice, information and advocacy for not only those in need, but the whole community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Social services

General public

Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

The Organisation is governed by a Board of Trustees which meet regularly. Day-to-day operation of the organisation is handled by an appointed co-ordinator.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 26/09/2021 $171,608 $132,125
30/09/2020 25/08/2020 $67,797 $95,509
30/09/2019 15/10/2019 $91,476 $86,974
31/10/2018 2/12/2018 $105,029 $78,590
30/09/2017 26/11/2017 $135,697 $85,553
30/09/2016 5/06/2017 $87,386 $89,450
30/09/2015 17/09/2015 $99,352 $94,134
30/09/2014 29/09/2014 $83,561 $97,846
30/09/2013 15/08/2013 $86,752 $106,827
30/09/2012 15/11/2012 $72,656 $84,773

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Susan Frances Grimwood Trustee 20/06/2021
Kathryn Clare Trustee 3/12/2020
Leanne Fergusson Trustee 1/01/2020
Stephen Carswell Trustee 24/11/2016
Kerry Louise Little Co-ordinator 22/12/2010
Dianne Mary McLauchlan Trustee 14/05/1997
Patricia Maria Turner-Shead Trustee 14/05/1997

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Angela Anderson Trustee 17/06/2021
Christine McGregor Walker Trustee 17/06/2021
Jason Crew Trustee 17/06/2021
Kirsten Hartley Trustee 17/06/2021
Chris Walker Trustee 28/01/2021
Hayley Hurst Trustee 27/01/2021
Michael Baker Trustee 27/01/2021
Cotrina MacLeod Patron 1/09/2019
Jillian Rae Scammell Patron 31/12/2017
Yvonne Mahia Whatarau-Tainui Trustee 31/12/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/06/2021 NOC021
28/01/2021 NOC020
28/01/2021 NOC019
27/01/2021 NOC018
27/01/2021 NOC017
27/01/2021 NOC016
16/10/2019 NOC014
3/05/2018 NOC010
15/08/2013 AR006
16/08/2012 AR005

Charity Documents