Use this to find information about a particular charity.
Charity Summary
Charity Details
Registration details
Registration history
Registration Action | Date effective | Deregistration Reason |
---|---|---|
Registered | 21/10/2020 | |
De-registered | 13/11/2019 | This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 41 of the Charities Act. |
Registered | 30/06/2008 |
Address for service
Charity's other details
Purpose & Structure
Charitable Purpose
Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.
(Provides centre for community activities), Provides buildings / facilities / open space
(Tutamoe Community), Children / young people, Older people, General public
Entity Structure
Annual Returns
Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.
Exemptions
This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 March 2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 March 2010.
Officer Details
Officers
Past Officers
Charity Updates
Charity Documents
Date Uploaded | Document Type | Reference Name |
---|
No supporting documents.