pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The NZ Federation of Young Farmers Clubs Incorporated
NZ Young Farmers/ NZYF
CC37379
9429042785415
Registered

Registration details

2/02/2009
September 30

Address for service

PO Box 23141
Templeton
Christchurch
8445
185 Kirk Road
Templeton
Christchurch
7678

Charity's other details

03 303 3059


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To be the global provider of excellence- growing capability, connectivity and prestige within and between rural and urban communities.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Other (please state)

(Primary Industries)

Children / young people

General public, Rural Based Youth

Entity Structure

The organisation is managed by a board consisting of 4 elected Young Farmers, 3 strategic partners and the CEO. The CEO oversees a Senior Leadership Team consisting of 2 Department heads (General Manager of Pathways and Events and Sponsorship Manager) plus a National Finance Manager. The organisation has a wide array of local clubs, District Committees, Regional Committees and Contest Committee.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Donald Pearson Farms Limited (Non-Registered Entity) N/A

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/03/2021 17/01/2021 $2,135,787 $2,170,873
31/03/2020 30/03/2020 $3,174,174 $3,141,813
31/05/2019 22/05/2019 $8,478,120 $3,819,636
31/03/2018 8/04/2018 $3,732,723 $3,471,944
31/03/2017 4/09/2017 $3,603,581 $3,559,406
31/03/2016 31/08/2017 $3,658,000 $3,437,408
31/03/2015 21/02/2015 $1,021,891 $548,133
31/03/2014 28/03/2014 $2,138,030 $2,299,105
31/03/2013 10/04/2013 $878,857 $699,951
31/03/2012 4/04/2012 $812,812 $731,291

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jessie Ann Waite Elected Board Member 4/07/2020
Robert Tarn Marsden BARRY Elected Board Member 26/03/2020
Catherine McMillan Independent Director 10/12/2019
Kent Mitchell Weir Elected Board Member 6/07/2019
Lynda Coppersmith CEO 3/10/2018
Ash-Leigh Elizabeth Campbell Chairperson - Elected Board Member 8/07/2018
Samuel Robinson Independent Board member 19/06/2018
Sharon Angus Independent Board member 19/06/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Hannah Grace Camerson Elected Board Member 4/07/2020
Rebecca Eileen Brown Contest Representative 4/07/2020
Chelsea Millar Elected Board Member 6/07/2019
Jason Te Brake Board Member 6/07/2019
Renata Donal Te Rito Hakiwai Co Opted Board Member 1/06/2019
Hamish Best Elected Board Member 31/10/2018
Terry Copeland CEO 13/07/2018
Dean Ashley Rabbidge Contest Representative 8/07/2018
Elaine Cook Director 19/06/2018
Jeffrey James Grant Director 19/06/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/03/2015 NOC008
23/01/2014 NOC007
4/04/2013 AR006
20/07/2012 AR005
4/04/2012 AR004
9/01/2012 NOC002

Charity Documents