pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Dunedin Youth Orchestra Incorporated
DYO
CC36651
9429042714415
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

502 Queens Drive
Dunedin Central
Dunedin
9016
65 Hanover Street
Dunedin Central
Dunedin
9016

Charity's other details

Facebook icon image
Dunedin Youth Orchestra


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promote the playing, practice and performance of music in an orchestra for 13 to 25 year old musicians and to train promising players for future careers in music.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Organise a training orchestra for promising young musicians), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research

Children / young people

General public

Entity Structure

Members of the DYO elect a management committee which includes a Chair, Secretary, Treasurer, 2 player representatives and between 2 to 7 non players. The committee appoint conductors and tutors to train the orchestra.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2021 31/03/2021 $29,489 $22,741
30/06/2020 29/04/2020 $33,638 $29,700
30/06/2019 26/03/2019 $24,161 $28,283
30/06/2018 22/05/2018 $23,239 $28,394
30/06/2017 9/03/2017 $21,752 $31,099
30/06/2016 16/05/2016 $40,923 $29,029
30/06/2015 6/06/2015 $35,618 $25,479
30/06/2014 24/07/2014 $29,253 $27,725
30/06/2013 3/06/2013 $32,199 $29,404
30/06/2012 20/05/2012 $31,245 $24,276

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Goeknil Meryem Biner committee member 27/03/2021
Mandy Mok Chairperson 27/03/2021
Olive Ward Player Rep 27/03/2021
Philippa Jayne Fotheringham Committee member 27/03/2021
Ella George committee member 22/03/2019
Bea Ward committee member 28/04/2018
Rebecca Meikle Secretary 18/12/2016
Kirsten Anne McAuley Treasurer 31/03/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Courtney Hickmott committee member 27/03/2021
Ellen Walters Chair 27/03/2021
Josh Lewis Co-chair 27/03/2021
Lydia Ford committee member 27/03/2021
Anges Sun committee member 30/06/2020
Richard Gayfer committee member 3/04/2020
Moriah Osbourne committee member 26/03/2020
Nathaniel Otley committee member 30/11/2019
Claudia Cooke committee member 30/06/2019
Josh Meikle committee member 30/06/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
1/04/2021 NOC016
18/11/2020 NOC015
27/06/2019 NOC013
3/05/2017 NOC010
15/03/2017 NOC009
12/01/2017 NOC007
24/07/2014 NOC006
20/05/2012 AR005
20/05/2011 AR004
13/06/2010 AR003

Charity Documents