pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Accelerating Aotearoa Incorporated
CC36186
9429043173891
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Accelerating Auckland Incorporated 30/06/2008
Accelerating Aotearoa Incorporated 21/07/2010

Address for service

27 Dexter Avenue
Mount Eden
Auckland
1024
40 Lovegrove Crescent
Otara
Auckland
2023

Charity's other details

021 967 975
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/accelakl/
https://www.facebook.com/accelaot/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Accelerating Aotearoa ensures NZs potential growth is unconstrained by shortages of digitally skilled Kiwis by Fostering collaboration across communities, educators and businesses Enabling mechanisms for collaboration for these stakeholders Better aligning programmes offered by educators with business needs Developing/implementing programmes supporting increased participation of Maori and Pasifika in digital upskilling Promoting digital careers with students Developing/implementing digital capability programmes enabling community productivity and innovation

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Develops Skills Programmes

Community development

Education / training / research, Social services, Employment, Economic development

General public

Children / young people, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

Our Core Group governance comprises community business & education leaders. A small secretariat is supported by 30+ partners & 75+ volunteers Work comprises of community-based solutions; -Engaging Whanau in career visioning & mentoring -Igniting educational success through student skills acquisition -Opening pathways to plentiful well paid work By supporting pathways to industry talent needs we're enabling connections for youth their whanau & communities with pathways to prosperity & equity

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2020 3/09/2020 $102,081 $129,489
30/09/2019 20/08/2019 $134,005 $212,790
30/09/2018 8/08/2018 $177,713 $157,357
30/09/2017 29/09/2017 $179,825 $78,133
30/09/2016 30/09/2016 $52,420 $51,265
30/09/2015 14/09/2015 $48,050 $69,076
30/09/2014 25/09/2014 $106,233 $79,779
30/09/2013 23/09/2013 $13,111 $44,085
30/09/2012 19/09/2012 $16,889 $18,592

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Sullivan Luau Paea Core Group Member 3/08/2020
Huia Murupaenga Core Group Member 19/06/2019
Igor Portugal Core Group Member 19/06/2019
Elena Fa'amoe-Timoteo Core Group Member 25/09/2014
Brijesh Sethi Core Group Member 23/08/2013
Filemoni Timoteo Core Group Member 26/08/2011
John Holley Chairman 8/07/2010
Peter John MacLeod MacAulay Treasurer 30/06/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Chris Hambling Core Group Member 1/09/2020
Saia Latu Core Group Member 1/09/2020
Mark Farnsworth Core Group Member 5/03/2020
Doug Standring Core Group Member 29/09/2016
Michael Myers Core Group Member 29/09/2016
Stephen Thorpe Core Group Member 29/09/2016
Abdolhossein Sarrafzadeh Core Group Member 28/09/2016
Ajit Narayanan Officer 25/09/2014
Andrew Bonica Chairman 25/09/2014
Anthony Norris Officer 25/09/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
25/03/2020 NOC016
16/12/2015 NOC011
26/09/2014 NOC010
23/09/2013 AR006
14/01/2013 NOC005
18/09/2012 AR005
26/09/2011 NOC004
12/09/2011 AR004
31/08/2010 NOC003
19/08/2010 AR003

Charity Documents