pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Royal New Zealand Coastguard Incorporated
Coastguard New Zealand
CC36138
9429042872511
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 33559
Takapuna
Auckland
740
Level 2
470 Parnell Road
Parnell
Auckland
1052

Charity's other details

(09) 489 1510
(09) 337 0765


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide marine safety, education and search and rescue services to the New Zealand public.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Emergency / disaster relief

Education / training / research, Promotion of volunteering, Marine Search and Rescue

General public

Entity Structure

72 entities comprised of 1 National parent entity, 1 National education entity, 1 national charitable trust, 4 regional offices, 4 local charitable trusts and 61 local units

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Auckland Coastguard Incorporated CC24814
Clyde Coastguard Incorporated CC43629
Coastguard Bluff Incorporated CC33201
Coastguard Canterbury Incorporated CC30649
Coastguard Central Region Incorporated CC35436
Coastguard Dunedin Incorporated CC47245
Coastguard Eastern Region Incorporated CC42992
Coastguard Hibiscus Incorporated CC34499
Coastguard Houhora Incorporated CC49426
Coastguard Kaikoura Incorporated CC20381
Coastguard Kaipara Incorporated CC34757
Coastguard Kapiti Coast Incorporated CC23056
Coastguard Lake Brunner Incorporated CC44290
Coastguard Lake Taupo Association Incorporated CC30755
Coastguard Mackenzie Lakes Incorporated CC46271
Coastguard Maraetai Incorporated CC34194
Coastguard Marlborough Incorporated CC40693
Coastguard North Canterbury Incorporated CC46958
Coastguard North Kaipara Incorporated CC40997
Coastguard North Shore Incorporated CC23033
Coastguard Opotiki Incorporated CC38345
Coastguard Queenstown Incorporated CC22641
Coastguard South Canterbury Incorporated CC25314
Coastguard South Taranaki Incorporated CC31578
Coastguard Southern Region Incorporated CC39454
Coastguard Turangi Incorporated CC34606
Coastguard Tutukaka Incorporated CC23809
Coastguard Wanaka Lakes Incorporated CC47347
Coastguard West Coast Incorporated CC41769
Coastguard Whangaroa Incorporated CC25479
East Cape Volunteer Coastguard Association Incorporated CC49764
Gisborne Volunteer Coastguard Association Incorporated CC27331
Great Barrier Island Coastguard Rescue Incorporated CC42295
Hawkes Bay Volunteer Coastguard Charitable Trust CC27700
Hawkes Bay Volunteer Coastguard Incorporated CC37817
Hokianga Volunteer Coastguard CC41041
Howick Volunteer Coastguard Incorporated CC26370
Kawau Volunteer Coastguard Incorporated CC21596
Maketu Volunteer Coastguard Incorporated CC41821
Mana Volunteer Coastguard Incorporated CC24215
Manawatu Volunteer Coastguard Incorporated CC38404
Nelson Volunteer Coastguard Incorporated CC33023
Northland Coastguard Air Patrol Incorporated CC24322
Papakura Volunteer Coastguard Incorporated CC41535
Raglan Volunteer Coastguard Incorporated CC25431
Riverton Coastguard Incorporated CC22259
Rotorua Lakes Volunteer Coastguard Incorporated CC20789
Royal New Zealand Coastguard Boating Education Limited CC26452
Royal New Zealand Coastguard Charitable Trust CC26905
Tairua/Pauanui Volunteer Coastguard Incorporated CC36782
Taranaki Volunteer Coastguard Service Incorporated CC38018
Tauranga Volunteer Coastguard Association Incorporated CC41954
Thames Volunteer Coastguard Incorporated CC36078
Titirangi Volunteer Coastguard Incorporated CC39200
Waihau Bay Volunteer Coastguard Association Incorporated CC42682
Waiheke Volunteer Coastguard Charitable Trust CC24157
Waiheke Volunteer Coastguard Incorporated CC39299
Waihi Beach Volunteer Coast Guard Incorporated CC32979
Waiuku Search and Rescue Association (Incorporated) CC41606
WANGANUI VOLUNTEER COASTGUARD INCORPORATED CC20974
Wellington Volunteer Coastguard Incorporated CC24610
Whangamata Volunteer Coastguard Incorporated CC28278
Whangarei Volunteer Coastguard Incorporated CC22006
Whangaruru Volunteer Coastguard Incorporated CC10479
Whitianga Volunteer Coastguard Incorporated CC34494

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 - - - - To be filed
31/12/2019 20/12/2019 $33,110,788 $23,507,313
31/12/2018 20/12/2018 $21,507,705 $20,126,311
28/02/2018 23/03/2018 $19,896,760 $19,237,361
31/12/2016 28/02/2017 $19,778,119 $17,991,977
31/12/2015 16/12/2015 $5,928,095 $6,081,182
31/12/2014 21/12/2014 $5,858,036 $5,979,768
31/12/2013 17/12/2013 $4,989,773 $4,842,167
31/12/2012 24/12/2012 $4,547,891 $4,683,774
31/12/2011 14/12/2011 $4,549,452 $4,615,945

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Graham Brown Northern Region Appointee 19/10/2019
Trevor Burgess Central Region Appointee 19/10/2019
Marilyn Brady Ex- Officio 10/08/2019
John Linn Elected Board Member 2019 20/12/2018
Jonathan Walmisley Southern Region Appointee 20/12/2018
Ed Crook Co-opted Member 28/10/2017
Mike Purchase President 28/10/2017
Peter Kara Board Member 19/10/2016
Richard Packham Eastern Region Appointee 1/12/2015
Aaron Wallace Vice President 1/10/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Patrick Holmes Chief Executive Officer 4/11/2019
Nigel Christopher Griffiths Board Member 19/10/2019
Wallis Hawken Northern Region Appointee 19/10/2019
John Cowan Ex-officio Member 30/08/2019
Henry Van Tuel President 14/10/2018
Nicola Hockley Southern Region Appointee 14/10/2018
Richard Chapman Elected Board Member 14/10/2018
Graham Brown Northern Region Appointee 28/10/2017
Matthew Rea-Rankin Elected Board Member 28/10/2017
Douglas Griffin Elected board member 19/10/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
4/06/2020 NOC016
11/11/2019 NOC013
13/06/2016 NOC009
11/02/2016 NOC008
10/02/2016 NOC007
13/07/2015 NOC006
29/10/2013 NOC001
24/12/2012 AR005
14/12/2011 AR004
8/12/2010 AR003

Charity Documents