pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Maritime Archaeological Association Of New Zealand Incorporated
MAANZ
CC35955
Registered
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Maritime Arcaeological Association Of New Zealand Incorporated 12/12/2008
Maritime Archaeological Association Of New Zealand Incorporated 22/12/2009

Registration details

11/12/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 23233
Wellington
6140
159 Karepa Street
Brooklyn
Wellington
6021

Charity's other details

04 566 0278
04 977 5660


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promote research into all aspects of maritime archaeology in New Zealand and related areas in the Pacific To foster community awareness in maritime archaeology, historic shipwrecks, marine relics and sites To encourage the use of appropriate archaeological procedures, materials and techniques for the investigation of maritime archaeological sites, including appropriate preservation and conservation of shipwrecks, marine relics and artefacts.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Undertake research; Act as resource body

Arts / culture / heritage

General public

Entity Structure

Members elect a committee comprising President, Vice-President, Secretary, Treasurer, Membership Secretary and a minimum of three and maximum of ten other members. There are no paid employees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2017 18/05/2018 $5,964 $5,374
31/12/2016 7/03/2017 $5,342 $2,667
31/12/2015 7/02/2017 $4,199 $3,373
31/12/2014 7/02/2017 $3,016 $2,681
31/12/2013 6/12/2013 $5,327 $6,695
31/12/2012 21/12/2012 $4,448 $6,847
31/12/2011 19/12/2011 $2,702 $2,966
31/12/2010 30/12/2010 $2,103 $2,037
31/12/2009 22/12/2009 $10,209 $10,027

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Robert Michael Strachan Johnston Committee member 20/09/2017
Tim Skinner Vice-President 28/09/2016
Jack Fry Membership Secretary 12/12/2008
John Ackrill Treasurer 12/12/2008
Malcolm McGregor Committee 12/12/2008
Michael Penfold Committee 12/12/2008
Richard Gray Committee 12/12/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Mary O'Keeffe President & Secretary 7/03/2018
Bruce Collins Committee 7/03/2017
Ken Scadden Committee 17/10/2016
Bridget Buxton Committee 23/09/2015
Elizabeth Charlton Committee member 23/09/2015
Andrew Dodd Committee 8/09/2010
Paddy Driver Committee 8/09/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
18/05/2018 NOC009
6/12/2013 NOC006
21/12/2012 AR005
30/12/2010 AR003
22/12/2009 AR002
22/12/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents