pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The National Kiwi Recovery Trust
CC35606
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 13046
Armagh
Christchurch
8141
15 Show Place
Addington
Christchurch
8011

Charity's other details

03 371 2613
03 341 6792


Group Members


Below are all the members of Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
CNI Tourism Limited
Dart River Safaris Limited
Glacier Southern Lakes Helicopters Queenstown Limited
Helicopters Queenstown Limited
Hoaka Limited
Hollyford Valley Walk Limited
Hukafalls Jet Limited
MWD Helicopters Limited
Ngai Tahu Aquaculture Services Limited
Ngai Tahu Charitable Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Refer to the Constitution.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Protection And Preservation Of Kiwi), Sponsors / undertakes research

Care / protection of animals

Environment / conservation

Other (please state)

(All Of the Above), Children / young people, Older people, Animals, General public

Entity Structure

Corporate trustee for Charitable Trust.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2018 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2017 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2016 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2015 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2014 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2013 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2012 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2011 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2010 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2009 Member of 'Ngāi Tahu Charitable Group' group - click here to view Annual Return

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Rainbow Springs Limited Trustee 16/04/2006

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/03/2018 NOC009
23/03/2018 NOC008
23/03/2018 NOC007
2/04/2015 NOC004
14/06/2011 NOC003
18/10/2010 NOC002

Charity Documents