pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


EON Foundation New Zealand
CC32749
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
May 31

Address for service

PLAZA BUILDING
PO Box 425
Surfdale
Waiheke Island
1081
Plaza Building
Box 425
Surfdale
Waiheke Island
1081

Charity's other details

0224462888

Asia

Burma (Myanmar), Cambodia


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our mission is to promote education and learning

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Acts as connector of people and ideas - EON Helps spread the word

Education / training / research

Environment / conservation, Community development, Arts / culture / heritage, International activities, Economic development, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, Teachers and Learners who harness the power of ICT

Entity Structure

Our structure is flat.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/11/2018 23/08/2018 $0 $312
30/11/2017 10/12/2017 $0 $0
30/11/2016 25/05/2017 $0 $0
30/11/2015 25/05/2017 $0 $0
30/11/2014 1/11/2015 $0 $0
30/11/2013 7/01/2014 $0 $176
30/11/2012 11/01/2013 $2 $0
30/11/2011 13/12/2011 $2 $165
30/11/2010 23/11/2010 $0 $50
30/11/2009 27/10/2009 $50 $1,800

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
John Eyles Chairman 14/08/2003

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Loretta Brown Secretary 5/12/2016
Ian Murray Howard Trustee 1/06/2016
Owen Stuart Mccall Trustee 1/06/2016
Phil Garing Trustee 1/06/2016
Charlie Brown Trustee 20/11/2010
Hamilton Laughland Treasurer 20/11/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/11/2010 NOC003
23/11/2010 AR003
5/05/2010 NOC002
27/10/2009 AR002

Charity Documents