pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Creative Sounds Society Incorporated
The Stomach
CC32254
9429042666974
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 586
Palmerston North Central
Palmerston North
4440
84 Lombard Street
Palmerston North
4410

Charity's other details

06 359 0120
Facebook icon image
www.facebook.com/TheStomach.NZ/
Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/wearethestomach
https://www.instagram.com/thestomach.nz/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide music facilities and expertise to support the pursuits of creative and original musical arts and emerging artists in the Palmerston North and surrounding regions.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Arts / culture / heritage

Community development

Children / young people

General public

Entity Structure

Creative Sounds is an incorporated society, governed by a management committee whom are elected by the membership. The society operates the facility known as The Stomach.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2019 - - - - To be filed
31/12/2018 10/10/2018 $171,507 $191,886
31/12/2017 1/02/2018 $141,970 $169,634
31/12/2016 23/11/2016 $90,522 $172,706
31/12/2015 2/02/2016 $126,917 $156,692
31/12/2014 13/11/2014 $134,045 $180,235
31/12/2013 13/08/2014 $81,685 $181,352
31/12/2012 27/02/2013 $130,298 $185,175
31/12/2011 14/03/2012 $148,958 $173,632
31/12/2010 15/03/2011 $150,887 $198,241

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Fraser Williams Secretary 9/10/2018
Lauren Annear Henderson Convenor 27/09/2016
Meredith Anne MacKenzie Treasurer 12/10/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Stuart Hubbard Secretary 2/10/2018
Abi Symes Secretary 27/09/2016
David Stevens Convenor 27/09/2016
Hayden Sinclair Chairperson 27/09/2016
Josh Finegan Treasurer 12/10/2015
Bettina Neil Committee Member 13/10/2014
Graeme William Thomas Officer 13/10/2014
Pam Carlton Committee 13/10/2014
Paul Goodwin Committee Member 13/10/2014
Penelope Foord Committee Member 13/10/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/05/2016 NOC011
14/05/2016 NOC010
14/05/2016 NOC009
14/05/2016 NOC008
13/11/2014 NOC007
18/06/2013 NOC001
27/02/2013 AR006
14/03/2012 AR005
15/03/2011 AR004
28/05/2010 AR003

Charity Documents