pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Destiny Church Wellington
CC31401
9429043086894
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
February 28

Address for service

PO Box 13707
Johnsonville
Wellington
6440
120 Johnsonville Road
Johnsonville
Wellington
6037

Charity's other details

(04) 5637263


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide religious services, activities and programs to the lower North Island region.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, Employment, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Care / protection of animals, Economic development, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

Religious groups

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

Structure is a Board of Trustees (four people), four paid staff, and 90 volunteers

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/08/2019 - - - - To be filed
31/08/2018 2/09/2018 $340,064 $344,884
31/08/2017 30/08/2017 $327,930 $308,022
31/08/2016 28/08/2016 $256,082 $235,331
31/08/2015 27/08/2015 $262,077 $266,706
31/08/2014 2/10/2014 $319,188 $330,005
31/08/2013 31/08/2013 $391,840 $420,225
31/08/2012 31/08/2012 $551,038 $483,698
31/08/2011 29/08/2011 $505,433 $510,772
31/08/2010 1/09/2010 $493,880 $478,326

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Epirosa Robertson Trustee 29/08/2016
Heker Robertson Trustee 1/06/2013
Samuelu Fuataga Trustee 1/06/2013
Hannah Radclavina Huirangi Tamaki Chairman 10/06/2003

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Ana Miriam Draper Trustee 24/12/2013
John James Ferris Trustee 1/06/2013
Jean Pearl Hunt Trustee 26/06/2012
Michael Draper Trustee 13/09/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/08/2016 NOC007
5/06/2014 NOC006
31/08/2013 AR006
31/08/2012 AR005

Charity Documents