Use this to find information about a particular charity.
Charity Summary
Charity Details
Deregistration details
The charity is now operating under CC55929.
Financial information at the time of Deregistration:
Below are details of North Harbour Living Without Violence Incorporated at the date of deregistration:
Registration details
Registration history
Registration Action | Date effective | Deregistration Reason |
---|---|---|
De-registered | 1/07/2021 | The charity is closing down permanently or has closed down (winding up) |
Registered | 30/06/2008 |
Name change history
Name | Effective Date |
---|---|
North Harbour Living Without Violence Collective Incorporated | 30/06/2008 |
North Harbour Living Without Violence Incorporated | 17/10/2008 |
Address for service
Charity's other details
Purpose & Structure
Charitable Purpose
Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.
Provides advice / information / advocacy
Education / training / research
Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees
Entity Structure
Annual Returns
Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.
Exemptions
This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.
Officer Details
Officers
Past Officers
Charity Updates
Charity Documents
Date Uploaded | Document Type | Reference Name |
---|
No supporting documents.