pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Destiny Church Whakatane Trust
CC30992
9429042993414
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
February 28

Address for service

PO Box 769
Whakatane
3158
100 Valley Road
Whakatane
3120

Charity's other details

073070853
073070853
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/destinywhakatane/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our objective is to build a large, great, spirit filled church that is both creative and redemptive in all it's expression, impacting Whakatane and surrounding areas, sharing the message of Jesus Christ. We endeavour to be a relevant church to the men and women of our community and we commit to pursuing the following: - Provide biblical preaching that encourages the members to serve and honour God in all areas of life - Provide effective services and programmes to equip and inspire members to live out their faith - Integrate the members into the service of our church's ministries - Help those outside our congregation who are in need as God gives us the ability and opportunity

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, Employment, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Economic development, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

Religious groups

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

Our trust is governed by a board of trustees (no less than four), with two full-time and 2 part-time staff employed to manage the day to day operations of the church.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/08/2019 - - - - To be filed
31/08/2018 3/09/2018 $392,707 $385,920
31/08/2017 31/08/2017 $474,401 $426,555
31/08/2016 27/08/2016 $382,061 $347,486
31/08/2015 28/08/2015 $323,002 $341,131
31/08/2014 2/10/2014 $323,939 $335,208
31/08/2013 31/08/2013 $350,004 $329,532
31/08/2012 31/08/2012 $370,211 $386,897
31/08/2011 29/08/2011 $366,408 $393,005
31/08/2010 31/08/2010 $363,676 $344,462

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Stephen Malcolm Towns Trustee 18/11/2017
Andre George Nicholas Trustee 13/01/2006
Wahia Marea Jayne Nicholas Trustee 13/01/2006
Junior Te Ariki Rua Trustee 10/04/2003
Wiki Ihe Trustee 10/04/2003

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Ray Rangitautini Wihapi Trustee 25/07/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/08/2016 NOC005
13/06/2013 NOC001
31/08/2010 AR003

Charity Documents