pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Moriel Ministries NZ
CC29661
N/A
Deregistered
11/04/2017
This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 41 of the Charities Act.

Below are details of Moriel Ministries NZ at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31
Registration history
Registration Action Date effective Deregistration Reason
De-registered 11/04/2017 This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 41 of the Charities Act.
Registered 30/06/2008

Address for service

PO Box 3269
Hawkes Bay Mail Centre
Napier
4142
PO Box 3269
Hawkes Bay Mail Centre
Napier
4142

Charity's other details

06 843 2110
Not Applicable


Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Religious activities

Religious groups

Children / young people, Older people, General public


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2017 - - - - To be filed
30/09/2016 - - - - To be filed
30/09/2015 - - - - To be filed
30/09/2014 11/02/2015 $0 $0
30/09/2013 19/11/2013 $41,670 $0
30/09/2012 31/12/2012 $16,200 $90
30/09/2011 31/08/2011 $42,480 $50,725
30/09/2010 17/09/2010 $37,358 $41,338
30/09/2009 1/10/2009 $52,000 $37,000

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Dennis Lyth Member 30/06/2008
Nigel Rodney Nicholson Treasurer 30/06/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/11/2013 NOC005
23/12/2012 AR005
31/08/2011 AR004
1/10/2009 AR002

Charity Documents