pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


U3A Wellington City Incorporated
CC29331
9429042898511
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 24529
Manners Street
Wellington
6142
43 Calcutta Street
Khandallah
Wellington
6035

Charity's other details

04 9777385


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

3.1 The purposes of the Society are – 3.1.1 To provide opportunities for older adults who are not in full-time employment to be engaged in further education, both as students and as tutors, free from the pressures of more formal education systems; 3.1.2 To conduct or provide lectures, courses, seminars and other means of education or study without any requirement for or award of qualifications; 3.1.3 To carry out such other activities as may promote membership of the Society and encourage friendship among members; 3.1.4 To provide grants, scholarships and other financial support to persons and organisations which may assist in the carrying out of any of the above purposes or which may have similar charitable purposes; 3.1.5 To do any other things which may help to achieve any of the above purposes.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Education for retired people.)

Education / training / research

Education fro retired people

Other (please state)

(Retired people), Older people

Entity Structure

4.1 The Committee may admit to membership any adult person who is not or is no longer engaged in full time employment or full-time family responsibilities. The control and management of the Society are vested in the elected Committee, which comprises the Officers (President, Treasurer) and not more than twelve other members.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 - - - - To be filed
31/12/2019 11/12/2019 $49,093 $48,923
31/12/2018 29/12/2018 $45,303 $46,526
31/12/2017 28/12/2017 $49,631 $50,076
31/12/2016 29/01/2017 $66,122 $37,764
31/12/2015 19/09/2015 $42,715 $38,387
31/12/2014 19/09/2014 $35,120 $38,775
31/12/2013 30/09/2013 $35,051 $40,716
31/12/2012 25/10/2012 $36,436 $28,460
31/12/2011 30/09/2011 $33,169 $23,442

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anthony James Thomson Treasurer 18/09/2015
Barbara Crump President 10/03/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Peter Hatfield President 17/09/2018
Gavin Mickell Treasurer 18/09/2015
Karen Palmer President 20/09/2013
Shona Spencer Treasurer 31/01/2011
Jill Waddington President 19/09/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
24/10/2019 NOC017
12/09/2018 NOC015
25/11/2016 NOC012
24/11/2016 NOC011
24/11/2016 NOC010
11/11/2016 NOC009
30/09/2013 AR008
25/10/2012 AR007
7/06/2011 AR005
19/04/2011 NOC002

Charity Documents