pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Queen Elizabeth The Second National Trust
CC28488
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 3341
Wellington
6140
138 The Terrace
Wellington Central
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 4726626
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/QEIINationalTrust
Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/QEIINatTrust


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

QEII National Trust works in partnership with landowners to protect native biodiversity, and other values on their private land for the benefit of present and future generations. The landowner retains ownership of the land they are protecting. QEII provides the legal protection. QEII's vision is to inspire new protection and stewardship and to inspire New Zealanders to work with, and support us, to protect private land.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Secure Protection Of Natural Features On Private Land), Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Environment / conservation

General public

Landowners And All New Zealanders

Entity Structure

Registered Trust.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2020 23/12/2020 $9,280,951 $8,367,987
31/12/2019 23/12/2019 $8,237,917 $11,876,893
31/12/2018 20/12/2018 $10,189,652 $5,904,948
31/12/2017 19/12/2017 $6,876,494 $4,791,280
31/12/2016 13/03/2017 $6,491,487 $13,064,801
31/12/2015 18/02/2016 $6,861,446 $4,997,670
31/12/2014 4/01/2015 $4,215,397 $4,211,099
31/12/2013 8/01/2015 $4,176,908 $3,709,628
31/12/2012 24/12/2012 $4,514,977 $3,856,968

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Alan Livingston Board Director 28/07/2020
Bruce Wills Chairperson 28/07/2020
Karen Schumacher Board Director 28/07/2020
Neil Cullen Board Director 28/07/2020
Daniel Coup Chief Executive 7/10/2019
Graham Neil Kenneth Mourie Board Director 15/03/2019
Donna Field Board Director 11/03/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Gina Solomon Board of Director 27/07/2020
Susan (Sue) Yerex Board of Director 27/07/2020
James Guild Chairman 30/06/2020
Mike Jebson Chief Executive 9/08/2019
Michael Legge Board Director 31/03/2019
Margot Fraser-Jones Finance Manager 30/11/2017
James Hunter Trustee 29/02/2016
Megan Balks Trustee 29/02/2016
Bernard Card Trustee 1/11/2014
Edward Ellison Trustee 1/06/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/10/2020 NOC015
23/12/2019 NOC013
20/12/2017 NOC010
31/01/2017 NOC008
18/11/2015 NOC007
5/01/2015 NOC006
24/12/2012 NOC001
9/12/2011 AR005
8/12/2010 AR004

Charity Documents