pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Otago Accommodation Trust
CC28066
9429042792444
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 2321
South Dunedin
Dunedin
9044
Flat 6
51 Manor Place
Dunedin Central
Dunedin
9016

Charity's other details

0800287879
0000000000


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The provision of long term rental accommodation to ensure coordination of ongoing support for people with mental health and associated disabilities.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Accommodation / housing

People with disabilities

Entity Structure

Single Trust with Board contracting a Manager.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2020 - - - - To be filed
30/09/2019 10/06/2020 $369,959 $273,269
30/09/2018 20/12/2018 $366,848 $286,448
30/09/2017 20/12/2018 $367,742 $290,193
30/09/2016 13/12/2018 $371,015 $299,193
30/09/2015 13/11/2016 $393,976 $304,062
30/09/2014 16/11/2015 $354,507 $325,016
30/09/2013 9/07/2013 $352,184 $264,508
30/09/2012 16/08/2012 $357,000 $283,500
30/09/2011 16/08/2011 $353,837 $301,969

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Clifford James Seque board member 15/07/2008
Helen Margaret Burnip Trustee 30/06/2008
Helen Irene Davidson Trustee 30/06/2008
John Charles Aldis Trustee 30/06/2008
Maryse Annette Stanton Trustee 30/06/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
John Anthony Fallon Board Member 14/09/2016
Peter Graeme Dalton Trustee 25/01/2016
Pat Tilyard consumer rep 1/01/2013
Graham Arthur Hambleton Trustee 30/11/2012
Peter Graeme Stanton Board Member 1/04/2011
Neil Ronald Watson Trustee 1/02/2010
Michael John McAlevey Trustee 7/07/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/10/2016 NOC009
3/12/2015 NOC008
9/07/2013 AR006
16/08/2012 AR005
16/08/2011 NOC003
29/09/2010 AR003
19/11/2008 NOC002

Charity Documents