pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Platform Charitable Trust
CC27856
9429043180011
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 6380
Marion Square
Te Aro
Wellington
6141
Level 3
181 Thorndon Quay
Pipitea
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 385 0385


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

A flourishing, innovative, well connected community based mental health and addiction service sector that makes a difference in the lives of individuals and communities

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides advice / information / advocacy

Health

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Community development, Social services, Employment, People with disabilities

Other charities

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

We have a small team (3.2 FTEs) governed by a Board of Trustees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 - - - - To be filed
31/12/2019 10/12/2019 $490,799 $479,427
31/12/2018 6/11/2018 $526,547 $501,567
31/12/2017 28/11/2017 $536,633 $506,783
31/12/2016 6/04/2017 $430,326 $438,603
31/12/2015 16/11/2015 $443,444 $425,535
31/12/2014 3/10/2014 $507,496 $437,086
31/12/2013 30/10/2013 $404,744 $393,626
31/12/2012 12/11/2012 $347,563 $338,620
31/12/2011 1/11/2011 $409,892 $419,552

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kristina Sofele Trustee 21/02/2019
Thomas Cardy Trustee 21/02/2019
Karaitiana Tickell Trustee 6/06/2018
Sally Pitts-Brown Trustee 15/08/2017
Barbara Disley Trustee 27/02/2013
Naomi Cowan Trustee 18/04/2012
Lynette Hutson Trustee 11/12/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Robert Leslie Warriner Trustee 17/10/2019
Kay Patricia Fletcher Trustee 16/10/2018
Mark Gosche Trustee 27/04/2018
Donald Gordon Shand Trustee 15/08/2017
Jacqueline Mary Graham Trustee 15/08/2017
Philip Albert Grady Trustee 18/10/2016
Paul Lyon Ingle Trustee 1/02/2016
Kathryn Leafe Trustee 13/10/2015
Derek Wright Trustee 16/06/2015
Jan Dowland Trustee 25/06/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/03/2019 NOC031
1/03/2019 NOC030
26/10/2018 NOC028
3/08/2018 NOC027
3/05/2018 NOC026
19/09/2017 NOC024
12/09/2017 NOC023
31/10/2016 NOC021
19/04/2016 NOC020
12/04/2016 NOC019

Charity Documents