pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Atatu Union Parish Church
Te Atatu Union Church
CC26977
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

2 Taikata Road
Te Atatu Peninsula
Auckland
0610

Charity's other details

09 834 3228
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/teatatuparish/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Te Atatu Union Parish Church purpose and mission is making Jesus Christ known and providing social and missional services to the community in Te Atatu and surrounding areas within our borders as Parish.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

General public

Children / young people, Older people, Family / whanau, Religious groups

Entity Structure

Our church is a Union between Methodist and Presbyterian who have agreed to fellowship and worship God together promoting unity within the church and community. Our governance council is Chairman plus 12 council members congregation selected every three years at AGM. We are govern by the rules of The Uniting Congregations of Aotearoa NZ.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This entity has been granted an exemption pursuant to s43 from the requirement to provide individual branch rules - the UCANZ "Guide to Procedures" has been deemed to be sufficient as it binds all constituent parishes.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2020 15/11/2020 $97,630 $81,529
31/12/2019 1/11/2019 $138,916 $119,510
31/12/2018 10/10/2018 $120,568 $164,650
31/12/2017 5/12/2017 $126,992 $165,463
31/12/2016 9/11/2016 $160,895 $161,832
31/12/2015 28/10/2015 $135,131 $165,887
31/12/2014 6/11/2014 $130,186 $140,550
31/12/2013 14/10/2013 $131,525 $130,657
31/12/2012 4/12/2012 $129,729 $152,719

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Talaitupu Fa'amausili Minister 3/08/2020
Lynn Denise Holland Treasurer 1/07/2018
Dilys Davies Secretary 24/08/2014
Elu Salasolo Mailata Senior Elder 23/08/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Wayne Toleafoa Chairperson/Minister 1/03/2020
Werner Schroeder Minister 15/01/2020
Graeme Russel White Chairperson / Minister 23/08/2014
Lynley White Secretary 23/08/2014
Norman Goreham Secretary 23/08/2009
Yvonne Patricia Weatherill Treasurer 23/08/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
28/01/2021 NOC016
16/01/2021 NOC015
20/05/2020 NOC013
18/11/2019 NOC012
15/11/2019 NOC011
17/10/2018 NOC009
13/09/2018 NOC007
6/11/2014 NOC004
3/12/2009 AR002

Charity Documents