pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Puna Ora O Mataatua Charitable Trust
CC26592
9429042841630
Registered

Registration details

24/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 729
Whakatane
3158
84 Mcgarvey Road
Whakatane 3120
Whakatane
3120

Charity's other details

0800 628 228
07 308 0580


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To improve and enhance the holistic health and well-being of all whanau, hāpū, and iwi within the Mataatua rohe through a kaupapa Māori framework.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides home based support services

Health

Social services, People with disabilities

People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2019 - - - - To be filed
31/12/2018 3/04/2019 $6,659,337 $7,562,589
31/12/2017 20/12/2017 $4,913,221 $5,251,359
31/12/2016 4/08/2016 $3,629,428 $3,430,178
31/12/2015 11/01/2016 $3,848,409 $3,346,749
31/12/2014 3/03/2015 $3,002,228 $2,842,195
31/12/2013 25/11/2013 $2,768,958 $2,720,539
31/12/2012 18/12/2012 $2,883,808 $2,612,859
31/12/2011 13/01/2012 $2,493,611 $2,192,195
31/12/2010 12/01/2011 $1,978,969 $1,878,467

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Arihia Tuoro Trustee 9/12/2016
Amohaere Tangitu Trustee 17/11/2016
Karl Smith Trustee 18/08/2016
Brian Simpson Deputy Chairperson 11/11/2013
Fiona Wiremu Chairperson 11/11/2013
Cletus Maanu Paul Trustee 20/12/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Dr Hinemoa Elder Trustee 31/12/2018
Te Makarini Temara Trustee 26/02/2017
Hemi Hireme Trustee 26/02/2016
Georgina Rarotapuhikura Iopata Trustee 12/02/2016
Erina Ata Trustee 28/10/2013
Hine Tihi Trustee 28/10/2013
Rita Rangitaia Wordsworth Trustee 28/10/2013
Sheryl Lee Ferguson Trustee 28/10/2013
John Bluett Trustee 9/12/2011
Julian Tunui Trustee 9/12/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
25/03/2019 NOC017
13/09/2017 NOC013
28/08/2017 NOC012
28/08/2017 NOC010
1/11/2016 NOC008
22/03/2016 NOC007
24/11/2015 NOC006
15/11/2012 AR006
12/01/2011 AR004
22/03/2010 AR003

Charity Documents


Notices

The trustees agree that as a condition of registration the Trust Deed will be given effect as if the non-charitable provision in clauses 10 and 11 of the Trust Deed have been removed from the Trust Deed in accordance with section 61B of the Charitable Trusts Act 1957.