pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Christian Blind Mission International (New Zealand)
cbm New Zealand
CC26154
9429042954163
Registered

Registration details

18/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 303477
North Harbour
Auckland
751
UNIT B
112 Bush Road
Rosedale
Auckland
632

Charity's other details

(09)4149405
(09)4473274
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/CBMNZ/

Oceania

Fiji, Papua New Guinea, Samoa, Tonga, Vanuatu

Africa

Burkina, Burundi, Ethiopia, Kenya, Madagascar, Nigeria, Rwanda, South Sudan, Tanzania, Uganda, Zimbabwe

Asia

Bangladesh, India, Laos, Nepal, Philippines


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

cbm New Zealand is an active member of an International Christian development organisation committed to improving the quality of life of persons living with disabilities in the poorest countries of the world.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Support to projects)

People with disabilities

Health, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, International activities, Fund-raising

People with disabilities

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2021 29/06/2021 $4,119,922 $3,600,361
30/06/2020 12/06/2020 $3,147,006 $3,037,683
30/06/2019 19/06/2019 $3,820,406 $3,624,270
30/06/2018 29/06/2018 $3,655,622 $3,507,608
30/06/2017 21/06/2017 $4,433,497 $2,664,770
30/06/2016 12/06/2016 $2,870,982 $2,459,294
30/06/2015 22/05/2015 $2,981,821 $3,147,602
30/06/2014 1/07/2014 $3,270,549 $3,601,931
30/06/2013 28/06/2013 $3,545,950 $3,337,149
30/06/2012 28/06/2012 $3,108,838 $2,665,352

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
John Bergin Trustee 19/03/2020
Geraldine Eldred Crudge Trustee 20/01/2020
Andrew Philip Smith Trustee 21/07/2019
Veronia Elizabeth Houghton Trustee 18/03/2019
Murray Kenneth Sheard Chief Executive Officer 20/08/2018
Tony John McLean Trustee 2/05/2015
Raymond James Coster Trustee 1/02/2015
Susan Jane Willis-Hirst Chairperson 9/12/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Leslie George Stephenson Trustee 17/06/2021
Wayne Henry Hanna Trustee 14/05/2019
Colin Ross Abernethy Trustee 26/04/2019
Jonathan Rae Hensman Chairperson 29/11/2018
Michael David Potter Acting Chief Executive Officer 19/08/2018
Stephen Craig Hunt Chief Executive Officer 13/07/2018
Helen Green Chairperson 28/10/2016
Wolfgang Fischer Trustee 9/12/2015
William Anthony Van Dam Board Member 16/10/2015
Fiona Morris National Director 7/06/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
9/09/2020 NOC040
29/01/2020 NOC038
25/09/2019 NOC037
16/05/2019 NOC035
30/04/2019 NOC034
29/04/2019 NOC033
14/01/2019 NOC032
14/01/2019 NOC031
24/08/2018 NOC030
13/07/2018 NOC029

Charity Documents