pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Empower International Trust
Empower Asia
CC25962
9429042942269
Registered

Registration details

16/06/2008
March 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Sure Destiny Trust 17/06/2008
Empower International Trust 23/06/2009

Address for service

PO Box 2334
South Dunedin
Dunedin
9044
46 Grey Street
RD 3
Gladstone
Invercargill
9810

Charity's other details

03-2186334

Asia

Cambodia, India, Nepal, Thailand


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To empower local indigenous people to care for their own impoverished and at-risk youth via operating safe houses for children so that they may receive good all-round care and quality education.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Youth work), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Social services

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health

Children / young people

People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Entity Structure

The charity is run as a Trust with a governance board.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 - - - - To be filed
30/09/2018 29/09/2018 $360,383 $373,138
30/09/2017 28/09/2017 $459,727 $450,970
30/09/2016 28/09/2016 $615,352 $576,535
30/09/2015 27/09/2016 $409,556 $416,495
30/09/2014 23/09/2014 $457,881 $435,735
30/09/2013 7/03/2014 $383,129 $464,449
30/09/2012 30/09/2012 $328,050 $340,685
30/09/2011 31/08/2011 $399,055 $367,940
30/09/2010 18/10/2010 $289,122 $260,134

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Paul Somerville Trustee 17/06/2008
Wilma Main Trustee 17/06/2008
Hamish Angus Crooks Trustee 1/07/2005
Carlie Somerville Trustee 25/02/1998

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/08/2012 AR005
31/08/2011 AR004
18/10/2010 AR003
16/07/2010 NOC003
27/07/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents