pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Hā o Hine-ahu-one Palmerston North Women’s Health Collective Incorporated
Palmerston North Women's Health Collective
CC24790
9429042819554
Registered

Registration details

22/05/2008
March 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
The Palmerston North Women's Health Collective Incorporation 23/05/2008
Te Hā o Hine-ahu-one Palmerston North Women’s Health Collective Incorporated 29/08/2018

Address for service

PO Box 4253
Manawatu Mail Centre
Palmerston North
4442
53 Waldegrave Street
Palmerston North
4410

Charity's other details

(06) 3570314
nil
Facebook icon image
pnwomenshealth


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

TE MOEMOEĀ VISION Our vision, moemoeā: a future where every woman/wahine understands, cares for and is able to heal her body, mind, spirit, whānau, community and te taiao the natural environment. TE MATAWHĀNUI MISSION STATEMENT Te Hā o Hine-ahu-one Palmerston North Women’s Health Collective empowers wāhine/women and their whānau to have more control over their health and fertility.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Health

Community development, Social services

Other (please state)

(Women), Children / young people

Entity Structure

Incorporated Society Collective Structure

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 - - - - To be filed
30/09/2018 5/09/2018 $133,760 $137,646
30/09/2017 28/09/2017 $136,473 $115,415
30/09/2016 24/10/2016 $137,670 $135,287
30/09/2015 18/09/2015 $141,332 $132,759
30/09/2014 19/09/2014 $130,414 $131,815
30/09/2013 27/09/2013 $137,760 $130,644
30/09/2012 2/10/2012 $135,750 $130,835
30/09/2011 16/09/2011 $120,582 $128,719
30/09/2010 23/08/2010 $115,423 $117,055

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Lorna Ryland governance member 1/04/2019
Hannah Kuriger governance member 30/10/2018
Rebecca Margaret Hancock Community Health Worker 13/02/2017
Bridget Caroline Duncan governance member 15/11/2016
Ashley Dawn Dodunski governance member 9/11/2016
Lynette Merle Clough Advisor member 21/01/2016
Karlie Trina Willis Advisor member 11/04/2014
Deanne Painter Advisor Member 19/09/2013
Krys Baker Governance Member 1/12/2011
Morgan J'Han'A Booker Community Health Worker 7/01/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Rebecca Margaret Gommans Community health worker 5/09/2018
Shantahlia Janaya Korau governance member 28/04/2017
Sonia Anderson Governance Member 13/10/2016
Susan Marie Lynch Governance Member 17/03/2016
Linsey Higgins Collective Member 18/02/2016
Sarah Marie Flood Governance Member 16/04/2015
Jully Makatia Governance Member 19/03/2015
Muer Zhang Governance Member 15/08/2013
Rachel Buck N/A 9/05/2013
Sue Cranston Governance Member 6/12/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/08/2019 NOC028
29/08/2018 NOC025
29/08/2018 NOC024
22/06/2017 NOC020
22/06/2017 NOC019
22/06/2017 NOC018
21/09/2016 NOC016
27/09/2013 AR006
9/05/2013 NOC012
29/08/2012 NOC011

Charity Documents