pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Otago Children's Autism Support Group Trust Board
CC24355
9429043132133
Registered

Registration details

13/05/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 5783
Moray Place
Dunedin Central
Dunedin
9058
34 Dunrobin Street
Waverley
Dunedin
9013

Charity's other details

03 454 5007


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Board provides information and support to parents of children who have been diagnosed with autism. Practical support is provided by providing ABA therapy by IASADD qualfied Therapists

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provide Education Services

Education / training / research

Fund-raising, People with disabilities

Children / young people

People with disabilities, Children With Disabilities

Entity Structure

There are four Trustees with overall responsibilty for the management of the Board

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 28/09/2018 $50,822 $57,834
30/09/2017 19/09/2017 $64,306 $64,223
30/09/2016 4/10/2016 $65,598 $62,557
30/09/2015 5/10/2015 $110,639 $105,924
30/09/2014 21/10/2014 $109,419 $109,711
30/09/2013 25/10/2013 $122,684 $144,912
30/09/2012 12/09/2012 $134,795 $139,192
30/09/2011 28/09/2011 $124,436 $100,793
30/09/2010 20/09/2010 $87,636 $85,544
30/09/2009 28/09/2009 $111,902 $101,036

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Nigel Martin Hooton Trustee 21/02/2018
Rainy Lola McMaster Trustee 21/02/2018
Melanie Kay Stevenson Trustee 13/10/2008
Nicola Heath Herbert Trustee 13/10/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Rachel Anne Mortimer Trustee 21/02/2018
Walter Paul Rene Von Ballmoos Trustee 21/02/2018
Kerry William David Herbert Trustee 13/10/2008
Kim Caffell Trustee 13/10/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
8/04/2018 NOC008
12/09/2012 AR005
28/09/2009 AR002
10/12/2008 NOC002

Charity Documents