pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


PILLARS Incorporated
CC23953
9429042812579
Registered

Registration details

5/05/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 7631
Sydenham
Christchurch
8240
50 Durham Street South
Sydenham
Christchurch
8023

Charity's other details

(03)3773990
Facebook icon image
facebook.com/Pillars.inc/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

A charity to provide support to the children of families of prisoners in New Zealand.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Social services

Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Children / young people

Family / whanau

Entity Structure

The Board of Governers consist of a President, Vice President, Secretary, Treasurer, Takata Whenua representative, Chief Executive (in an ex officio role) and other members appointed at an annual general meeting that is usually held before November of each year. Board members must be financial members of the society. The board has four committees as follow: Personnel, Policies and Assets, PR and Fundraising, Finance. There is also an operational Programmes Committee.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2019 - - - - To be filed
31/12/2018 19/12/2018 $1,401,595 $1,364,752
31/12/2017 19/12/2017 $1,062,472 $1,061,682
31/12/2016 15/12/2016 $987,251 $891,387
31/12/2015 22/12/2015 $757,990 $826,406
31/12/2014 18/12/2014 $828,364 $869,754
31/12/2013 27/11/2013 $679,833 $674,403
31/12/2012 10/12/2012 $667,764 $662,608
31/12/2011 17/11/2011 $573,136 $557,949
31/12/2010 28/10/2010 $641,779 $618,331

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Glenda Mary Martin Board Member 6/11/2018
Helen Margaret Leahy Board Member 6/11/2018
Logan Peter Smedley Board Member 6/11/2018
Manu Llewellyn Stone Board Member 6/11/2018
Sandra McCullum Board Member 6/11/2018
Ward Allan Kamo Board Member 21/05/2018
Darragh O'Riordan Board Member 17/10/2017
Georgia Coates Evans Secretary 17/10/2017
Paul Edgar James Evans Treasurer 15/08/2017
Elizabeth Audrey Gordon President 17/06/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Gilbert James Taurua Board Member 6/11/2018
Colleen Hannah Luisetti Board Member 17/10/2017
Mark Rhys Taylor Board Member 17/10/2017
Tapu Tuisuga Board member 23/05/2017
Blake Elliot Carey Board Member 18/04/2017
Darragh O'Riordan Board Member 21/02/2017
Darren Michael Allchurch Treasurer 20/10/2016
Fiona Sheryl Pimm Board Member 19/04/2016
Sonia-Lee Pratt Board Member 20/10/2015
John Andrew George Trustee/President 4/11/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/12/2018 NOC031
1/06/2018 NOC030
19/12/2017 NOC029
15/05/2017 NOC027
15/05/2017 NOC026
22/12/2015 NOC023
22/12/2015 NOC022
22/12/2015 NOC021
17/06/2015 NOC020
18/12/2014 NOC019

Charity Documents