pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Auckland Theatre Company Limited
CC23655
9429038995330
Registered

Registration details

30/04/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 96002
Balmoral
Auckland
1342
487 Dominion Road
Mount Eden
Auckland
1024

Charity's other details

09 309 0390
09 309 0391


Group Members


Below are all the members of The Auckland Theatre Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Auckland Theatre Company Limited
The Theatre Foundation

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Auckland Theatre Company collaborates with professional artists and practitioners to create vital theatre experiences which enrich the lives of New Zealand audiences.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Promotes Performance), Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research, Community development, Fund-raising

General public

Children / young people, Other charities

Entity Structure

Auckland Theatre Company is a limited liability company with Charitable Status. All the shares of the Company are owned by the Theatre Foundation. Auckland Theatre Company Ltd and The Theatre Foundation are registered charitable entities. Auckland Theatre Company is governed by a Board of Directors and has a permanent staff of 25.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2021 Member of 'The Auckland Theatre Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2020 Member of 'The Auckland Theatre Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2019 Member of 'The Auckland Theatre Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2018 Member of 'The Auckland Theatre Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2017 Member of 'The Auckland Theatre Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2016 Member of 'The Auckland Theatre Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2015 Member of 'The Auckland Theatre Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2014 Member of 'The Auckland Theatre Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2013 Member of 'The Auckland Theatre Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/06/2012 Member of 'The Auckland Theatre Group' group - click here to view Annual Return

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jonathan Bielski Chief Executive Officer 22/07/2019
Alison Quigan Board Member 15/03/2019
Graeme Ross Pinfold Board Member 16/05/2018
Katie Rebecca Jacobs Board Member 3/11/2017
Nicholas James De Bortali Tregerthan Senior Accountant 2/10/2017
Vivien Anna Bridgwater Board Member 9/06/2017
Timothy John MacAvoy Trustee/Officer 16/10/2015
Isaac Hikaka Director/Trustee 10/06/2015
Derek McCormack Board Member 27/11/2013
Karen Theresa Fistonich Board Member 8/09/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jonathan Bielski Chief Executive 1/05/2019
Jonathan Bielski Board Member 15/01/2019
Lester Vivian McGrath Chief Executive 11/01/2019
Scott Kerse Trustee/Board Member 6/12/2018
Ross Edward Green Board Member 5/12/2017
Kerry Raymond Tomlin Finance Officer 13/10/2017
Ann Hinton Trustee/Board Member 5/02/2015
Janelle Elizabeth McKenzie Operations Manager 12/09/2014
Kathleen Fitzmaurice Russell Business Manager 31/12/2013
Derek Kenneth McCormack Board Member 8/04/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/08/2020 NOC016
24/08/2020 NOC015
23/08/2020 NOC014
23/08/2020 NOC013
15/03/2019 NOC012
3/11/2017 NOC010
8/08/2017 NOC009
28/07/2016 NOC008
30/06/2016 NOC007
10/07/2015 NOC006

Charity Documents