pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Seniornet Mac Incorporated
Seniormac
CC23383
9429043069170
Registered

Registration details

23/04/2008
December 31

Address for service

41 Essex Street
Phillipstown
Christchurch
8011

Charity's other details

03 365 1979


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Seniornet Mac supports and motivates people aged 50 plus to enjoy and use technology in their everyday lives.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Education

Education / training / research

Community development, Arts / culture / heritage, People with disabilities

Older people

People with disabilities, General public, Family / whanau, Education

Entity Structure

We are a non-profit registered incorporated society that provides support and education in modern day technology for older adults.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2021 31/05/2021 $17,098 $16,289
31/08/2020 1/09/2020 $23,258 $31,645
30/06/2019 6/05/2019 $28,649 $35,019
30/06/2018 5/06/2018 $45,947 $49,927
30/06/2017 29/05/2017 $35,340 $40,626
30/06/2016 7/11/2016 $39,209 $34,051
30/09/2015 9/09/2015 $55,834 $86,332
30/09/2014 30/10/2014 $43,650 $39,506
30/09/2013 5/09/2013 $39,394 $35,192
30/09/2012 20/09/2012 $36,559 $35,126

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Bruce Perkins Membership Manager 1/04/2020
Barbara Robinson Services Manager 1/01/2019
Charlie Millar Vice President 5/04/2017
Erika Martha White Committee Member 18/07/2014
Janet Elizabeth Chesney Secretary/Treasurer 24/06/2014
Derek Stanley Brown Trustee 27/08/2013
Barbara Avis Blowes Chairperson 22/05/2007
Brian Stewart Henderson Trustee 22/05/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Mary Nicholson Elected Committee Member 31/03/2021
Christene Berry Committee Member 1/09/2020
Margaret Ann Harvey Treasurer 26/03/2019
Mary Crawford Nicholson Committee Member 26/03/2019
Barry Stewart Clark Committee Member 27/03/2018
Ethne Gail Wells Committee Member 5/04/2017
John Ross Heveldt Committee Member 26/04/2016
Robin Morton Harrington Committee Member 26/04/2016
Eva Hack Secretary 24/06/2014
Jennifer Ann Tyson Committee 24/06/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
31/05/2021 NOC020
1/09/2020 NOC018
26/05/2019 NOC017
6/05/2019 NOC016
24/04/2019 NOC013
5/06/2018 NOC011
10/02/2018 NOC010
3/07/2016 NOC008
30/10/2014 NOC007
5/09/2013 AR007

Charity Documents