pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Touch Compass Dance Trust Board
Touch Compass Dance Trust
CC23088
9429042980629
Registered

Registration details

16/04/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 331086
Takapuna
Auckland
740
1 St Leonards Road
Hauraki
Auckland
622

Charity's other details

022 530 3261
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/touchcompass/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Touch Compass is New Zealand’s leading professional performance company linking disabled and non-disabled artists. The company specialises in contemporary dance, aerial and art activations, dance-theatre performance, film, training, mentoring, workshops, community classes and education for schools. Working collaboratively with world-class choreographers, directors and performers our narratives are authentic, awe-inspiring, thought-provoking and challenging for artists and audiences. New and innovative technologies add an exciting new dimension challenging perceptions about performance and artists. As Touch Compass reached its 23rd year we are committed to evolving our arts and culture product from contemporary dance to a broader dance and performing arts spectrum.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provides programmes and performances)

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research, Community development, Social services, Employment, Sport / recreation, Economic development, People with disabilities

People with disabilities

Children / young people, General public

Entity Structure

The day-to-day operations of Touch Compass Dance Trust is managed by the General Manager and the artistic programme by the Artistic Director. The General Manager reports to the Board of Trustees who are volunteers and unpaid. The Trust Board comprises a minimum of three and maximum of seven Trustees including the Board Chair. Additional advisory Trustees are called upon from time-to-time.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/08/2020 1/09/2020 $640,918 $740,035
30/06/2019 5/07/2019 $694,645 $744,806
30/06/2018 29/06/2018 $634,445 $593,944
30/06/2017 26/06/2017 $527,088 $505,288
30/06/2016 30/06/2016 $526,015 $609,035
30/06/2015 29/06/2015 $560,591 $714,100
30/06/2014 9/06/2014 $512,609 $583,957
30/06/2013 27/06/2013 $616,517 $608,580
30/06/2012 16/07/2012 $407,883 $419,856

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Linda Parker-Wendt Trustee 13/11/2019
Romola Margaret Lang Trustee 13/11/2019
Guy Charles Evan Burbery Board Chair 27/04/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jane Blackmore Trustee 3/03/2020
John Paul Cash Trustee 3/03/2020
Helen Jacobi Board Chair 13/11/2019
Simon Pound Trustee 1/02/2019
Catherine Chappell Trustee 23/04/2018
Karen Fraser Payne Secretary/Acting Treasurer 27/11/2017
Alexandra Smith Trustee 14/04/2017
Rebecca Collins trustee 15/11/2016
Gillian Anne Wells Trustee 16/06/2016
Kathryn Amanda Olsen Trustee 19/04/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/03/2020 NOC016
16/03/2020 NOC015
4/03/2019 NOC013
27/02/2019 NOC012
23/06/2016 NOC009
18/08/2015 NOC008
9/06/2014 NOC007
6/06/2013 AR006
16/07/2012 NOC001
16/07/2012 AR005

Charity Documents