pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Zealand Opera Limited
New Zealand Opera
CC22724
9429038437717
Registered

Registration details

8/04/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 6478
Victoria Street West
Auckland Central
Auckland
1142
5/69 St George's Bay Road
Parnell
Auckland
1052

Charity's other details

(09)379 4020


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Enriching the cultural life of Aotearoa through an experience of opera that connects, engages and inspires reflection on our human condition

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Encouraging and engaging in the administration, education, creation, production and performance of opera)

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research

General public

Children / young people, Older people

Entity Structure

New Zealand Opera is a limited liability company whose sole shareholder is New Zealand Opera Holdings Trust. It is governed by a national board of ten directors who meet several times a year.The company is chiefly based in Auckland, in Parnell, which consolidates its production and administrative departments. Smaller teams operate in both Christchurch and Wellington.
New Zealand Opera Holdings Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2020 21/07/2020 $6,326,867 $5,628,864
30/06/2019 28/06/2019 $7,570,456 $7,671,752
31/07/2018 25/07/2018 $8,086,106 $8,645,177
30/06/2017 16/08/2017 $7,431,216 $7,282,082
30/06/2016 28/06/2016 $7,749,175 $7,459,103
30/06/2015 29/06/2015 $7,365,246 $7,350,918
30/06/2014 8/04/2014 $8,112,894 $7,687,274
30/06/2013 12/06/2013 $6,422,178 $7,009,057
30/06/2012 6/05/2012 $5,750,123 $5,714,995

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Murray George Shaw Director 21/07/2020
Leopino Foliaki Director 5/11/2019
Rachael Catharine Walkinton Director 26/09/2019
Witi Tame Ihimaera Smiler Director 15/05/2018
Annabel Holland Director 21/12/2016
Annika Catherine Streefland Director 2/11/2016
Matthew Henry Ormond Maling Director 28/05/2016
Zhiyun He Director 9/11/2015
Timothy Brown Director 10/11/2014
Suzanne Snively Director 25/07/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Philip King Director 18/10/2019
Storm Anna McVay Director 1/08/2019
Chanelle Farmer Director 13/05/2019
Edward John Harvey Director 28/09/2018
Donald Stanley Mackintosh Trott Director 14/09/2018
Kate Burtt Director 8/11/2016
Jennifer Norton Director 26/07/2016
Athol Wilson Mann Director 31/12/2014
David Rendel Kingston Gascoigne Chairman of Directors 24/09/2014
Reginald Barry Mora Board Member Director 24/09/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
25/06/2019 NOC015
31/05/2018 NOC013
12/03/2018 NOC012
8/06/2017 NOC009
19/12/2016 NOC008
14/03/2016 NOC007
7/01/2016 NOC006
12/06/2013 NOC001
26/04/2011 AR004
19/05/2010 AR003

Charity Documents