pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Kagyu Choeyang Ling Trust
Kagyu Choeyang Ling Nelson
CC22703
N/A
Registered

Registration details

8/04/2008
March 31

Address for service

485 Hill Street
Richmond
7020

Charity's other details

(03)5449362


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide authentic Mahayana Buddhist teachings and an environment conducive to the practice of that teaching within the Nelson area and New Zealand and principally those of the Karma Kagyu lineage of Tibetan Buddhism.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Arts / culture / heritage, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Religious groups

Children / young people, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Entity Structure

Governed by the Trust Board

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 - - - - To be filed
30/09/2018 10/09/2018 $20,087 $20,526
30/09/2017 24/10/2017 $22,296 $19,613
30/09/2016 30/09/2016 $21,454 $16,773
30/09/2015 25/08/2015 $49,805 $23,721
30/09/2014 28/09/2014 $20,257 $23,004
30/09/2013 16/09/2013 $33,919 $33,660
30/09/2012 9/09/2012 $27,208 $20,846
30/09/2011 8/09/2011 $22,000 $12,000
30/09/2010 14/09/2010 $6,000 $3,000

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Alexandra Partington Trustee 27/03/2012
Wilhelmina Flick Secretary 27/03/2012
Rhonda Gail Brownlees Chairperson/Treasurer 29/09/2005
Stuart Alexander Wright Trustee 29/09/2005

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
John Glaisyer Trustee 1/03/2012
Mary Glaisyer Trustee 1/03/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
10/06/2014 NOC006
16/09/2013 AR006
12/04/2012 NOC002
8/09/2011 AR004
14/09/2010 AR003
29/09/2009 AR002

Charity Documents