pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Operation Mobilisation
OM New Zealand
CC22286
9429042795148
Registered

Registration details

30/03/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 76882
Manukau City
Auckland
2241
20 Amersham Way
Level 6
Manukau
Auckland
2104

Charity's other details

(09)928 0802
Facebook icon image
http://www.facebook.com/omnewz
Twitter icon image
http://www.twitter.com/omnewz

Oceania

Australia, Papua New Guinea

Africa

Mozambique, Namibia, South Africa, Zambia, Zimbabwe

South America

Argentina, Brazil, Chile, Colombia, Ecuador, Paraguay, Peru, Uruguay

North America

Bahamas, Barbados, Canada, Costa Rica, Dominican Republic, El Salvador, Grenada, Guatemala, Haiti, Jamaica, Mexico, Panama, Saint Lucia, Saint Vincent and the Grenadines, Trinidad and Tobago, United States

Asia

Japan, Korea, South, Russian Federation, Singapore

Europe

Austria, Belgium, Bosnia and Herzegovina, Bulgaria, Czech Republic, Denmark, Finland, France, Germany, Greece, Hungary, Ireland, Italy, Macedonia, Moldova, Montenegro, Netherlands, Norway, Poland, Portugal, Romania, Serbia, Slovakia, Slovenia, Spain, Sweden, Switzerland, Ukraine, United Kingdom


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Mission statement: We want to see vibrant communities of Jesus followers among the least reached. Objects of the Board: (a) To spread the Gospel of the Lord Jesus Christ throughout the world. (b) To challenge and train Christian people to live the life of faith, love and prayer as set forth in the Scriptures. (c) To challenge, train and provide opportunity for Christian people to conceive a missionary vision and to engage in or support cross-cultural evangelism.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Emergency / disaster relief, International activities, Fund-raising

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Religious groups

Entity Structure

Operation Mobilisation is an incorporated society governed by a Trust Board. Day to day running is handled by a National Director plus administrative staff and volunteers. The Off the Grid training base in the South Island is run by full-time staff with volunteer assistance.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2019 30/06/2019 $317,730 $275,455
30/06/2018 6/12/2018 $583,997 $313,971
30/06/2017 10/07/2017 $673,272 $674,089
30/06/2016 29/06/2016 $648,855 $657,072
30/06/2015 30/06/2015 $537,400 $519,778
30/06/2014 30/06/2014 $507,975 $505,705
30/06/2013 29/06/2013 $144,513 $141,442
30/06/2012 15/05/2012 $139,176 $127,736
30/06/2011 18/05/2011 $357,866 $353,571
30/06/2010 12/05/2009 $358,310 $350,576

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Rick Iles Board Treasurer 30/06/2019
Graeme John Sutton Board Chair 18/05/2019
Pauline Mary Hocking Board Member 18/05/2019
Malcolm Horne Board Member 14/08/2017
Robin Kenneth McArthur Board Member 31/03/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Roger Larkins Board Member 18/05/2019
Ronald Frank Lang Board Member 26/05/2018
Susanna Mary Burton Board member 26/07/2017
Jane Barlow Trustee 28/05/2016
Ronald Frank Lang Secretary 11/05/2013
George Arthur Booth Managing Director 31/12/2010
Jeffery John Turner Chairman 31/05/2010
Rodney Donald Gabb Treasurer 31/05/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/07/2019 NOC020
1/07/2019 NOC019
30/06/2019 NOC017
6/12/2018 NOC015
31/10/2017 NOC014
31/10/2017 NOC013
14/08/2017 NOC012
11/07/2016 NOC010
28/06/2013 AR006
16/05/2013 NOC005

Charity Documents