pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Wellington Buddhist Centre Incorporated
Friends Of The Western Buddhist Order Wellington
CC22144
9429042915577
Registered

Registration details

26/03/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 12311
Thorndon
Wellington
6144
6 Broomhedge Street
Mount Cook
Wellington
6021

Charity's other details

0211059946
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/WellingtonBuddhistCentre/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The objects of the Centre shall be to advance the Buddhist faith in New Zealand by :- (a) Encouraging and educating members and others to live in accordance with the Teachings of The Buddha (b) Maintaining and developing the Wellington Buddhist Centre presently operated by the Triratna Buddhist Order, at either its present premises or at any other premises, for the purpose of furthering the other objects set out In this Rule (c) Supporting Order Members and other duly ordained Buddhists, at the Council's discretion, in their work for the Buddhist faith (d) Maintaining close communication with and working under the guidance of the Order, and In co-operation with the Triratna Buddhist Order

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Religious groups

General public

Entity Structure

An incorporated society operating as Wellington Buddhist Centre.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2020 - - - - To be filed
30/09/2019 12/07/2019 $57,553 $38,919
30/09/2018 14/06/2018 $46,715 $30,804
30/09/2017 16/09/2017 $36,542 $34,333
30/09/2016 8/07/2016 $41,173 $25,127
30/09/2015 16/07/2015 $34,346 $33,476
30/09/2014 21/05/2015 $28,612 $26,903
30/09/2013 7/08/2014 $42,760 $37,278
30/09/2012 21/05/2015 $51,609 $53,385
30/09/2011 9/08/2011 $50,650 $54,619

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Alison Minnery Council Member 13/10/2018
Christopher Bicknell Secretary 17/08/2018
Maureen Nicholl Chair 8/01/2017
Teresa Sammut Council Member 28/06/2015
Malcolm Dow Council Member 8/06/2014
Marcus Copsey Treasurer 27/03/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Dianne Laws Council Member 16/03/2019
Joanne Rae Dinsdale Secretary 28/07/2018
Kate Drury Council Member 31/12/2016
Prudence Mary Treadwell Secretary 31/12/2016
Donald James Woolford Council Member 22/03/2016
Joanne Rae Dinsdale Secretary 28/06/2015
Carol Loach Secretary 8/06/2014
Adele Chapman Council member 28/07/2013
Maureen Nichol Council member 28/07/2013
Caryl McKirdy Council Member 30/06/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/04/2019 NOC014
17/06/2018 NOC012
14/06/2018 NOC010
15/01/2017 NOC008
16/07/2015 NOC006
9/06/2014 NOC005
9/08/2011 AR004
27/07/2010 AR003
2/07/2010 NOC002

Charity Documents