pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Royal New Zealand Foundation Of The Blind Incorporated
Blind Foundation
CC21361
9429042573272
Registered

Registration details

25/02/2008
June 30
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Royal New Zealand Foundation Of The Blind 26/02/2008
Royal New Zealand Foundation Of The Blind Incorporated 26/09/2016

Address for service

Private Bag 99941
Newmarket
Auckland
1149
4 Maunsell Road
Parnell
Auckland
1052

Charity's other details

(09)3556900
(09)3660099


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Enable people who are blind or have low vision to be self-reliant and live the life they choose

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides services to blind visually - impaired, deafblind New Zealanders

People with disabilities

Education / training / research, Social services, Employment, Sport / recreation, Fund-raising

People with disabilities

Children / young people, Older people, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Royal New Zealand Foundation of the Blind a charity which is a statutory body empowered by the Royal New Foundation of the Blind Act 2002, an Incorporated Society and registered under the Charities Act 2005. The Blind Foundation is controlled by an elected Board of Directors.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Foundation Properties Limited CC50784
The Bledisloe-Royston Trust CC44156

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2019 - - - - To be filed
31/12/2018 21/11/2018 $43,778,000 $36,572,000
31/12/2017 21/09/2017 $40,825,000 $36,037,000
31/12/2016 30/09/2016 $37,686,000 $38,420,000
31/12/2015 24/11/2015 $35,302,000 $34,226,000
31/12/2014 20/11/2014 $31,875,000 $29,726,000
31/12/2013 18/11/2013 $36,270,000 $28,483,000
31/12/2012 26/11/2012 $30,754,000 $27,267,000
31/12/2011 21/10/2011 $32,802,000 $27,657,000
31/12/2010 10/12/2010 $26,647,000 $25,899,000

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Martine Abel-Williamson Director 4/05/2019
Deborah Lynne Boyd Director 11/11/2017
Fraser Thomas Alexander Director 11/11/2017
Gregory Thomas Hurn Chief Financial Officer 23/01/2017
Clive Johannes Lansink Board member 12/11/2016
Judith Small Director 9/11/2013
Carolyn Weston Director 3/11/2012
Peter Hoskin Director 3/11/2012
Keith Appleton Director 5/11/2010
Richard Bond Hoskin Director 7/11/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Nicola Owen Director 12/04/2019
Julie Bartlett Director 11/11/2017
Paul Sullivan Director 11/11/2017
Pamela June MacNeill Director 12/11/2016
Chung-Pin Lin Board Member 30/05/2016
David Heather Board Member 8/11/2014
Dr Neville Bennett Director 8/11/2014
Dr Gregory Ewen Morgan Board Member 15/11/2013
Geraldine Glanville Director 9/11/2013
Daniel Marcus Kerr Director 2/11/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/04/2016 NOC012
21/08/2015 NOC011
20/08/2015 NOC010
24/11/2014 NOC009
13/05/2013 NOC004
13/05/2013 NOC003
15/11/2012 AR006
7/03/2012 NOC002
10/12/2010 AR004
12/11/2009 AR003

Charity Documents