pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Autism New Zealand Incorporated
CC21220
9429042590354
Registered

Registration details

17/02/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 33481
Petone
Lower Hutt
5046
20 Sydney Street
Petone
Lower Hutt
5012

Charity's other details

(04) 8033501


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To empower people living with autism

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

People with disabilities

Education / training / research, Health, Social services, Fund-raising

People with disabilities

Children / young people, Older people, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

National organisation with 16 branches around NZ

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2018 14/12/2018 $2,351,925 $2,319,774
31/12/2017 18/12/2017 $2,620,521 $2,572,090
31/12/2016 19/12/2016 $3,109,266 $3,386,621
31/12/2015 11/05/2016 $3,599,519 $3,475,064
31/12/2014 12/05/2015 $2,995,261 $3,048,329
31/12/2013 30/01/2014 $3,474,604 $3,448,489
31/12/2012 15/11/2012 $2,871,637 $2,638,629
31/12/2011 30/11/2011 $2,594,855 $2,806,321
31/12/2010 26/01/2011 $2,489,000 $2,639,000
31/12/2009 5/01/2010 $1,717,286 $1,663,994

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kimberley Dobbie Board Member 14/12/2018
Tova Haydock Board Member 23/05/2017
Joanne Dacombe Board Member 1/11/2016
Hamish Fletcher Board Member 28/11/2015
James Le Marquand Chairperson 21/02/2015
Wendy Duff Board Member 7/11/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Doug Lloyd Chairperson 30/11/2018
Shakil Naidu Board Member 1/10/2017
Glenys Anne Fry Executive Member 28/11/2015
Martin Edward Wylie National Executive Member 28/11/2015
Stewart Mead trustee 28/11/2015
Jennifer Birch Trustee 1/11/2015
Fred Astle Board 1/07/2015
Sarah Turnbull trustee 1/04/2015
John Raymond Mckeown National Executive 1/11/2014
Angela Maree Arnold - Saritepe National Executive 3/11/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/04/2015 NOC012
6/10/2014 NOC010
15/11/2012 NOC007
30/11/2011 AR004
26/01/2011 AR003
19/01/2010 NOC006
5/01/2010 NOC005
26/01/2009 NOC004
11/09/2008 NOC003
3/06/2008 NOC002

Charity Documents