pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The University of Auckland
CC20421
9429042982005
Registered

Registration details

8/01/2008
December 31

Address for service

THE REGISTRY Private Bag 92019
Victoria Street West
Auckland
1142
THE REGISTRY
22 Princes Street
Auckland Central
Auckland
1010

Charity's other details

(09)3737999
(09)3737407


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Provides Services, Provides advice/information/advocacy, Provides Other Finance, Sponsors/Undertake research, Provides Human Resources, Provides buildings, facilities/open space

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Sponsors / undertakes research

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Provides religious services / activities

Education / training / research

Accommodation / housing, Health, Environment / conservation, Community development, Social services, Employment, Religious activities, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Care / protection of animals, International activities, Economic development, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, Animals, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

University's governing body is the Council, which comprises: elected staff & a student; a member appointed to advise on Maori issues; a member appointed from the alumni; Council & Ministerial appointees. The Vice-Chancellor is also a member of Council. Council is chaired by the Chancellor, who is a lay member of the Council. On academic matters, Council is bound to consult the Senate, which includes all the professors & representatives of sub-professorial and professional staff & of students

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Auckland UniServices Limited CC21514
The University Of Auckland Foundation CC10985

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 June 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 June 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2021 10/06/2021 $1,141,669,000 $1,179,431,000
30/06/2020 15/06/2020 $1,186,583,000 $1,135,537,000
30/06/2019 11/06/2019 $1,143,864,000 $1,085,160,000
30/06/2018 7/06/2018 $1,068,364,000 $1,032,736,000
30/06/2017 12/06/2017 $1,020,360,000 $970,862,000
30/06/2016 31/05/2016 $982,088,000 $923,657,000
30/06/2015 23/06/2015 $919,864,000 $875,769,000
30/06/2014 23/06/2014 $878,115,000 $851,450,000
30/06/2013 22/07/2013 $837,930,000 $808,969,000
30/06/2012 22/06/2012 $824,833,000 $802,061,000

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Rajen Prasad Council Member 24/03/2020
Dawn Freshwater Vice-Chancellor 16/03/2020
Catherine Agnes Quinn Council Member 26/02/2020
Jennifer Claire Curtin Council Member 1/01/2020
John Hepa Makimou Paitai Council Member 1/01/2020
Junyi Wong Council Member 19/11/2019
Rachael Newsome Council Member 1/04/2019
Cecilia Tarrant Council Member 1/01/2017
Catherine Dunphy Council Member 1/01/2016
James Bernard Metson Deputy Vice-Chancellor Research 1/01/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Stuart McCutcheon Vice Chancellor 15/03/2020
Andrew Ferrier Council member 26/02/2020
Ralph Norris Member of Council 26/02/2020
Alexandra Sims Member of Council 31/12/2019
Amokura Kawharu Council Member 31/12/2019
Anand Naranji Rama Member of Council 24/05/2019
Peter Thomas Kiely Member of Council 31/03/2019
Anna Cusack Council Member 31/12/2018
William Alexander Thompson Matthews Council Member 31/12/2017
Ian Murray Parton Member of Council 31/12/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
25/02/2021 NOC038
24/03/2020 NOC036
25/06/2019 NOC035
25/06/2019 NOC034
22/02/2019 NOC032
26/02/2018 NOC030
24/03/2017 NOC028
3/03/2017 NOC027
26/01/2016 NOC026
20/01/2016 NOC025

Charity Documents