pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The New Zealand Poetry Society Incorporated
New Zealand Poetry Society; NZPS
CC20250
9429042783183
Registered

Registration details

12/12/2007
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 5283
Pipitea
Wellington
6140
14 Albemarle Road
Northland
Wellington
6012

Charity's other details

(04)4759359
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/NewZealandPoetrySociety/
Twitter icon image
@nzps
instagram @nzpoetrysociety


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Advances education by promoting, developing and supporting poets and poetry in New Zealand

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Advances education by promoting, developing and supporting poets and poetry in New Zealand.

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research, International activities

General public

Children / young people, Older people

Entity Structure

We are a membership based society

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 30/09/2021 $25,903 $29,528
30/09/2020 29/09/2020 $154,454 $25,696
30/09/2019 13/11/2019 $15,739 $26,243
30/09/2018 30/09/2018 $15,976 $19,859
30/09/2017 30/09/2017 $14,751 $12,658
30/09/2016 15/01/2017 $24,808 $22,920
30/09/2015 28/09/2015 $18,006 $12,058
30/09/2014 22/10/2014 $18,834 $17,941
30/09/2013 24/09/2013 $20,332 $21,537
30/09/2012 26/09/2012 $25,348 $26,857

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Marina Lathouraki Treasurer 1/09/2021
Rikki Livermore Vice President & LGBTQIA+ Representative 16/06/2021
Gary Bradshaw Secretary 30/08/2020
Shane Hollands President 9/09/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Katharine Allard Treasurer 16/06/2021
Sue Le Mesurier Vice-President 16/06/2021
Laurice Gilbert Treasurer 31/07/2019
Mike Subritzky Vice President 31/12/2018
Anna Hudson Treasurer 19/11/2017
Katharine Allard Secretary 9/09/2017
Anna Hudson Secretary 8/09/2017
Laurice Denise Gilbert Acting President 8/09/2017
Laurice Gilbert President/National Coordinator 11/04/2016
Lonnard Dean Watkins Vice-President 11/04/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
8/10/2021 NOC031
30/09/2021 NOC030
31/07/2020 NOC027
27/07/2018 NOC024
7/12/2017 NOC023
23/05/2016 NOC019
22/10/2014 NOC014
24/09/2013 NOC011
24/09/2013 AR006
26/09/2012 NOC010

Charity Documents