pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Anxiety New Zealand Trust
CC20141
9429042782971
Registered

Registration details

28/11/2007
March 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
The Phobic Trust of New Zealand 29/11/2007
Anxiety New Zealand Trust 20/11/2014

Address for service

77 Morningside Drive
Mount Albert
Auckland
1025

Charity's other details

(09)8469776
(09)8492375
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/anxietynewzealand/
https://www.instagram.com/anxietynewzealandtrust/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Anxiety New Zealand Trust aims to improve the understanding surrounding anxiety and depression in New Zealand, provide support, education and treatment for children, youth and adults with anxiety related conditions and their families. The Trust offers high quality clinical, helpline, education and peer support services incorporating the experience and knowledge of tangata whaiora, consumers, family / whanau and an Advisory Group informing all levels of the organisation. Anxiety NZ is supported by the dedication of support and volunteer staff and offers internship placements to help support and develop future mental health professionals and health related leaders. The Trust will advocate for funding and support research into the determinants and treatment of anxiety disorders.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Education & Lobbying

Health

Education / training / research, Community development, Social services, Employment, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering, Marketing

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Entity Structure

The Trust is governed by a Board of Trustees. A CEO provides leadership, operational oversight and management. A Clinical Lead provides leadership. Psychologists and specialist GPs have clinical supervision. Administration is supported by a volunteer accountant, specialist IT support and administrative interns. The Helpline Manager manages volunteers, duty managers and clinical back-up staff. Peer Support Groups are facilitated with lived experience. An Advisory group informs all levels.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 27/09/2019 $660,311 $697,894
30/09/2018 29/09/2018 $581,158 $656,290
30/09/2017 25/09/2017 $547,943 $608,814
30/09/2016 28/10/2016 $542,525 $781,250
30/09/2015 3/07/2015 $526,890 $828,476
30/09/2014 9/12/2014 $625,648 $947,177
30/09/2013 24/09/2013 $751,821 $883,486
30/09/2012 1/11/2012 $702,500 $761,700
30/09/2011 22/02/2012 $764,584 $870,583
30/09/2010 14/10/2010 $810,330 $865,489

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Mike Richardson Board Member 27/08/2019
Jinhong Xie Board Member 27/09/2016
Michelle Proudfoot Board Member 11/09/2013
Alfred Stowers Board Member 1/06/2012
Robert Kidd Chairman 1/02/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Gary Browne Board Member 23/07/2019
Della-Maree Trask Board Member 14/07/2016
Marcia Read QSO Founder & CEO 27/06/2014
Vivienne Euini CEO 30/09/2013
Vivienne Euini NZ Stock Exchange Dip Chairman 30/09/2013
Della-maree Trask Trustee 31/08/2012
Jeana Aroha Jurisich B.Ed Dip Tchg TCC Trustee 31/08/2012
Arthur Anae Trustee 1/04/2012
Janet Fisher-Hepi Trustee 12/10/2011
Jenny Armstrong Trustee 4/11/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/09/2017 NOC014
10/12/2014 NOC012
10/12/2014 NOC011
10/12/2014 NOC010
9/12/2014 NOC009
24/09/2013 AR007
1/11/2012 AR006
22/02/2012 AR005
4/11/2010 NOC003
14/10/2010 AR004

Charity Documents