pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Court Theatre Trust
CC11114
9429042854630
Registered

Registration details

13/09/2007
January 31

Address for service

PO Box 268
Christchurch
8140
36c Clarence Street South
Addington
Christchurch
8024

Charity's other details

03 9630870
03 9630890
Facebook icon image
The Court Theatre
Twitter icon image
The Court Theatre


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide audiences with theatre of the highest quality by presenting the New Zealand voice on stage and by producing outstanding international and classic plays.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provides theatrical services.)

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research

General public

Children / young people, Older people

Entity Structure

The Court Theatre Trust is incorporated under the provisions of the Charitable Trust Act 1957 and registered as a charitable entity under the Charities Act 2005, registration number CC11114. The Court Theatre Trust has designated itself as a public benefit entity (PBE) for financial reporting purposes.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 June 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 June 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/07/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2020 3/11/2020 $5,392,006 $6,339,178
30/06/2019 26/06/2019 $5,849,376 $6,327,297
30/06/2018 19/06/2018 $5,616,803 $6,238,808
30/06/2017 23/06/2017 $6,135,181 $6,519,418
30/06/2016 31/05/2016 $5,565,205 $6,025,484
30/06/2015 22/04/2015 $5,908,207 $6,375,939
30/06/2014 6/05/2014 $5,216,461 $5,689,612
30/06/2013 21/05/2013 $8,262,659 $8,142,822
30/06/2012 15/08/2012 $8,056,374 $2,979,206

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.
= Balance Date Change
- This Annual Return will cover 13 months from 1 January 2020 to 31 January 2021.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anne Newman Trustee 26/10/2020
Georgina Toomey Trustee 26/10/2020
Susan Rendall Company Secretary 31/12/2018
David Feaver Trustee 11/04/2017
Erin Jamieson Trustee 15/04/2014
David McBrearty Trustee 16/04/2013
Rosemary Bonifant Trustee 16/04/2013
Steven Van Der Pol Chair 21/04/2010
Steve Wakefield Trustee 15/04/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jane Huria Trustee 28/09/2020
Stephanie Marsden Trustee 28/09/2020
Derek John Hargreaves Secretary 31/12/2018
Ian Douthwaite Trustee 11/04/2017
Yvette Bromley Trustee (Honurary Life) 13/10/2014
Erin Jamieson Trustee 16/04/2014
Vicki Blyth Trustee 29/10/2013
Felicity Price Trustee 16/04/2013
John Harrison Trustee 16/04/2013
John McSweeney Trustee 16/04/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
3/11/2020 NOC019
19/02/2020 NOC017
26/06/2019 NOC015
19/06/2018 NOC012
6/05/2016 NOC010
28/04/2015 NOC009
22/04/2015 NOC008
6/05/2014 NOC007
21/05/2013 NOC003
27/06/2012 AR005

Charity Documents