pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Cats Protection League Wellington Incorporated
Cats Protection Wellington
CC10864
9429042607946
Registered

Registration details

15/08/2007
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 12157
Thorndon
Wellington
6144
29 Vancouver Street
Kingston
Wellington
6021

Charity's other details

(04) 389 9668
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/WgtnCPL


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To care and find suitable homes for the cats in our care; to ensure the desexing of cats in our care and assist the public in the desexing of cats via our subsidised desexing programme and to educate the public on cat care and welfare.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Facilities and Services That Benefit Cats), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Care / protection of animals

Other (please state)

(Cats), Other charities, Animals, General public

Entity Structure

The League is a registered charity, run by members and volunteers and is governed by a committee of up to 10 (4 Executive Officers and 6 officers). As of Dec 2018 there are 2 people employed as Team leads to manage the shelter.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2020 24/08/2020 $768,827 $244,234
30/09/2019 11/11/2019 $1,692,577 $205,746
30/09/2018 10/08/2018 $431,782 $181,063
30/09/2017 13/09/2017 $544,595 $156,001
30/09/2016 1/09/2016 $317,325 $145,108
30/09/2015 29/08/2015 $496,590 $236,720
30/09/2014 10/11/2014 $269,585 $254,240
30/09/2013 10/12/2013 $848,216 $262,878
30/09/2012 28/03/2013 $166,297 $213,625
30/09/2011 14/09/2011 $190,483 $193,727

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Elizabeth Gray Committee member 3/10/2021
Charine Collins Committee member 17/05/2021
Deborah Jill Wareing committee member 23/08/2020
Sharon June Bailey Treasurer 14/07/2019
Asrai Mayes committee member 17/09/2018
Lauren Scoon secretary 15/07/2018
Amanda Louise Anne Smith vice president 16/07/2017
Iona Neil Anderson President 3/08/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Amy Helen Rountree committee member 3/10/2021
Jenna Christy Scott committee member 1/02/2021
Michele Addison-Wood Vice President 23/08/2020
Kate Curren Secretary 14/07/2019
Megan Temperton Treasurer 14/07/2019
Melanie Lynskey Committee member 14/07/2019
Delwyn Monk committee member 4/12/2018
Diane Szabo Committee member 22/01/2018
Marlene Carol Fitzgerald Committee member 16/07/2017
Akreeti Chaliha Committee member 27/04/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/07/2019 NOC026
13/09/2017 NOC023
6/09/2017 NOC021
9/07/2017 NOC020
19/08/2016 NOC018
21/08/2015 NOC017
8/10/2014 NOC016
10/12/2013 NOC014
25/06/2013 NOC009
22/05/2013 NOC008

Charity Documents