pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Moray Foundation Trust
CC10188
9429042765967
Registered

Registration details

18/04/2007
June 30

Address for service

301 Moray Place
Dunedin Central
Dunedin
9016

Charity's other details

0800 100 962
Facebook icon image
Moray Foundation Trust


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The aim of the fund is to try to create better living standards for those trapped in the cycle of poverty. To try to provide a way forward for families and individuals through micro credit with on-going support and financial advice through Budget Advisory Services. As a result of this help, people are able to resume living within their incomes. To clear their high cost indebtedness - to break the debt cycle; and to access financial support for important living necessities that will not accrue unnecessary high interest debt.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Social services

General public

Entity Structure

Trust Structure: Our Trust Deed, states that we must have between 5 and 7 Trustees. we currently have 5 that constitute our governance board; one is our chairperson and the others are trustees. Operational Structure: Our operations are managed by 1 part time Coordinator.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2018 30/11/2018 $8,210 $15,052
31/12/2017 1/07/2018 $17,004 $19,215
31/12/2016 19/12/2016 $7,655 $20,364
31/12/2015 10/12/2015 $13,196 $8,628
31/12/2014 6/03/2015 $13,642 $11,151
31/12/2013 29/10/2013 $11,100 $4,309
31/12/2012 5/12/2012 $8,867 $9,683
31/12/2011 4/11/2011 $11,107 $7,489
31/12/2010 15/11/2010 $8,051 $16,184
31/12/2009 30/10/2009 $65,211 $6,996

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Robert Wallace Thomson Trustee 1/01/2017
James Lovelock Trustee 14/11/2016
Michael Ferrari Trustee 11/04/2016
Philippa Robertson Deputy Chair 10/08/2015
Judy Marsh Chair 23/02/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Allan Andrew Paulin Trustee 31/10/2017
Christopher Watkins Trustee 30/06/2017
Norman Thompson Chairman of the Board 11/07/2016
Ruth Houghton Board Member 11/07/2016
Arthur Gordon Parry Trustee 31/03/2015
Bruce D Smaill Manageing Trustee 31/03/2015
Norma Shirley Jones Deputy chairman of the Trust Board 28/02/2013
Michael W Devereux Trustee 18/10/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/05/2018 NOC011
19/01/2016 NOC008
17/10/2013 AR008
5/12/2012 AR007
15/11/2010 AR005
30/10/2009 AR004
7/11/2008 AR003
16/01/2008 AR002

Charity Documents