pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Parent To Parent New Zealand Incorporated
Parent To Parent
CC10121
9429042802624
Registered

Registration details

27/03/2007
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 234
Waikato Mail Centre
Hamilton
3240
3RD FLOOR AMI BUILDING
420 Anglesea Street
Hamilton Central
Hamilton
3204

Charity's other details

(07)8538491
(07)8538491
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/parent2parentnz/?fref=ts


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Assisting Families or Whanau of people with disabilities or health impairments through Support and Information so that they are better placed to be able to assist those in their care.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

People with disabilities

Education / training / research, Health, Social services

Family / whanau

Children / young people, People with disabilities

Entity Structure

National office with 11 regional branches operating over NZ. Incorporated Society. Board Governance.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2007 under section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2008.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2018 29/11/2018 $1,655,689 $1,706,971
31/12/2017 11/12/2017 $1,659,841 $1,831,512
31/12/2016 22/11/2016 $1,579,697 $1,860,439
31/12/2015 15/11/2015 $1,231,591 $1,227,687
31/12/2014 25/02/2015 $1,635,274 $1,554,588
31/12/2013 11/12/2013 $1,417,971 $1,391,523
31/12/2012 21/12/2012 $1,318,803 $1,366,587
31/12/2011 15/11/2011 $1,609,119 $1,544,056
31/12/2010 21/12/2010 $1,062,093 $957,228
31/12/2009 1/12/2009 $1,158,197 $1,144,276

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Sarah Elizabeth Verran Board Member 3/11/2018
Jane Megan Bawden Chief Executive Officer 3/09/2018
Julie-Ann Rosalia Johnson Board Member 15/12/2017
Nicholas Wilkinson Board Member 15/10/2017
Joanna Eastwood Executive Manager 5/06/2017
Guy Ockenden General Manager 7/06/2016
Andrea Lee President 4/11/2012
Martin Gallagher Board member 4/11/2012
Peter Hugh Campbell Board Member 19/02/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Lorna Winifred Sullivan Board Member 3/11/2018
Noel Cunneen Chief Executive Officer 2/03/2018
Helen Susan Johnson Board member 15/10/2017
James Craig President 15/10/2017
Susan Warrington Board member 15/10/2017
Julie Catherine Barnett Executive Manager 8/05/2017
Anne Elizabeth Wilkinson Cheif Executive 1/07/2016
Rita Christine Hunter Harris National Board Member 2/11/2012
Charmeyne Te Nana-williams Board member 12/08/2012
Alastair Ronald Druett Board Member 30/10/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/12/2016 NOC015
27/07/2016 NOC013
27/07/2016 NOC012
25/11/2015 NOC011
13/12/2013 NOC010
20/12/2012 AR006
21/12/2010 NOC004
1/12/2009 AR003
28/11/2008 AR002
1/12/2007 NOC002

Charity Documents