pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The J R McKenzie Trust
J R McKenzie Trust Board
CC10562
9429042648024
Registered

Registration details

5/07/2007
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 10006
The Terrace
Wellington
6143
116 Lambton Quay
114 Lambton Quay
Wellington Central
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

(04)4728876
(04)4725367


Group Members


Below are all the members of J R McKenzie Trust Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Jayar Charitable Trust
The J R McKenzie Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To render assistance to organisations, institutions, societies, homes and other bodies for philanthropic, educational, recreational, charitable and other purposes.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Community development

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Social services, Employment, Economic development, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

Other charities

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 Member of 'J R McKenzie Trust Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/09/2017 Member of 'J R McKenzie Trust Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/09/2016 24/10/2016 $5,301,156 $4,216,379
30/09/2015 1/10/2015 $6,961,941 $4,435,836
30/09/2014 26/09/2014 $5,279,666 $3,838,250
30/09/2013 1/10/2013 $5,191,367 $3,588,957
30/09/2012 17/10/2012 $3,940,757 $3,440,825
30/09/2011 29/09/2011 $3,854,799 $2,459,884
30/09/2010 22/09/2010 $3,592,000 $3,670,000
30/09/2009 24/07/2009 $3,747,000 $3,917,000

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Jerry Norman Trustee 7/12/2018
Melissa Campbell Trustee 7/12/2018
Janice Farris Trustee 20/07/2018
Lili Tuioti Trustee 20/07/2018
Helen Anderson Office Administrator (not a Trustee) 1/02/2017
Anna Elizabeth Gibson Trustee 9/12/2016
Chelsea Maria Rachael Grootveld Trustee 9/12/2016
Jane Montgomery Trustee 9/12/2016
Christine Scott Trustee 18/03/2016
Paula Therese King Trustee 4/07/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Charles Ronald Edward Wilson Trustee 7/12/2018
Patrick John Cummings Trustee/ Chairman 7/12/2018
Liz Tanielu Trustee 19/12/2017
Liz Tanielu Trustee 19/12/2017
Charisma Rangipunga Trustee 8/12/2017
David Vance Trustee 9/12/2016
Lynsay Lorraine Holmes Trustee 9/12/2016
Eric Keys Trustee 4/12/2015
Te Puaiwai Tanga o Te Ao Hou Wereta Trustee 4/12/2015
Te Puawaitanga O Te Ao Hou Wereta Trustee 4/12/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/05/2016 NOC013
25/09/2014 NOC012
16/12/2013 NOC011
7/12/2012 NOC007
7/12/2012 NOC006
11/03/2011 NOC005
21/12/2009 NOC004
4/05/2009 NOC003
18/12/2008 NOC002
2/09/2008 AR002

Charity Documents