pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Jayar Charitable Trust
CC10878
9429042932345
Registered

Registration details

16/08/2007
March 31

Address for service

JAYAR CHARITABLE TRUST PO Box 10006
The Terrace
Wellington
6143
116 Lambton Quay
Level 4 114-118 Lambton Quay
Wellington Central
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

(04)4728876


Group Members


Below are all the members of J R McKenzie Trust Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Jayar Charitable Trust
The J R McKenzie Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Established in 1997, the Jayar Charitable Trust manages the investment of its funds and passes on available surpluses to the J R McKenzie Trust for distribution for various charitable purposes.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Social services

Education / training / research, Health, Community development

Children / young people

Other charities, Older people, People with disabilities, General public, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 Member of 'J R McKenzie Trust Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/09/2017 Member of 'J R McKenzie Trust Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/09/2016 24/10/2016 $603,509 $194,226
30/09/2015 17/09/2015 $2,246,677 $188,557
30/09/2014 26/09/2014 $1,085,632 $200,544
30/09/2013 24/09/2013 $1,322,563 $153,839
30/09/2012 27/09/2012 $146,577 $95,944
30/09/2011 19/08/2011 $694,688 $80,365
30/09/2010 5/08/2010 $2,546,320 $71,814
30/09/2009 3/09/2009 $-1,574,000 $25,000

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Beverley Richards Secretary 7/12/2018
Jonathan Usher Trustee 7/12/2018
Jane Montgomery Trustee 9/12/2016
Charles Pope Trustee 21/05/2007
Neville Caird Chairman/ Trustee 21/05/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Charles Wilson Trustee 7/12/2018
Helen Anderson Secretary 7/12/2018
Graeme Pentecost Chairman 6/12/2016
Jennifer Morel Trustee 21/11/2012
Peter McKenzie Trustee 23/08/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/12/2018 NOC015
16/08/2018 NOC014
4/04/2017 NOC012
28/09/2016 NOC009
12/05/2016 NOC008
15/11/2013 NOC007
7/12/2012 NOC003
22/08/2011 NOC002

Charity Documents