pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Just Move Charitable Health Trust
CC55414
N/A
Registered

Registration details

16/05/2018
March 31

Address for service

21 The Esplanade
Campbells Bay
Auckland
0630

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Trust is established for the following purposes: (a) To provide support to people who are affected by obesity, diabetes and/or cardio-vascular disease and to facilitate their recovery; and (b) for other charitable purposes according to the law of New Zealand which relate to the relief of poverty, the advancement of education or any other matter beneficial to the community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Health

Education / training / research

General public

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust with three trustees.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2020 28/09/2020 $411,615 $328,469
30/09/2019 30/09/2019 $54,033 $43,861

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Boris Sokratov Trustee 16/05/2018
Duncan Grant Garner Trustee 16/05/2018
Robert James Campbell Trustee 16/05/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
8/07/2020 NOC003

Charity Documents