pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Precept Ministries New Zealand Charitable Trust
Precept, Precept NZ
CC11106
Registered

Registration details

12/09/2007
December 31

Address for service

PRECEPT MINISTRIES NZ PO Box 276123
Manukau City
Auckland
2241
Precept Ministries Nz
20 Amersham Way
Manukau City
Auckland
2016

Charity's other details

(09) 928 0807
Facebook icon image
fb/preceptministriesNZ

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our mission is to establish people in God's Word to live as exemplary followers of Jesus Christ.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Religious activities

Education / training / research

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups, any individual

Entity Structure

Precept Ministries New Zealand is established and domiciled in New Zealand by Trust Deed. The trust is registered under the Charities Act 2005. Our Trust Deed states that there can be up to 7 Trust Board members. There are currently 2 Trustees in the role of the Chairman and the Secretary. The National Coordinator 1. Develops Bible study class leadership through training 2. Runs the office with volunteers 3. Reports back to and receives input from the trustees

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 June 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 June 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2018 13/03/2018 $23,834 $18,279
30/06/2017 14/03/2017 $16,462 $16,021
30/06/2016 29/03/2016 $27,696 $25,814
30/06/2015 23/03/2015 $14,054 $18,499
30/06/2014 1/04/2014 $22,562 $20,873
30/06/2013 5/03/2013 $18,101 $19,625
30/06/2012 21/05/2012 $27,084 $14,700
30/06/2011 26/04/2011 $12,240 $15,482
30/06/2010 20/04/2010 $15,447 $12,727
30/06/2009 18/05/2009 $12,921 $9,926

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
David James John Jensen Trustee 14/08/2014
Barbara Kipfer trustee 7/09/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Peter Kipfer trustee 16/06/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/12/2016 NOC009
28/06/2016 NOC008
21/10/2014 NOC007
5/11/2010 NOC003
18/05/2009 AR002
18/05/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents