pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Habitat for Humanity Greater Auckland Limited
Habitat for Humanity Auckland
CC24459
9429038570148
Registered

Registration details

15/05/2008
June 30

Address for service

8 Ormiston Road
Otara
Auckland
2019

Charity's other details

09 271 3357
09 271 3359
Facebook icon image
Habitat for Humanity Auckland


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Habitat for Humanity Greater Auckland Limited is a housing charity whose vision is a world where everyone has a decent place to live. Accordingly, its purpose is to relieve poverty through the provision of affordable, safe, healthy and sustainable housing solutions.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Accommodation / housing

Education / training / research, Community development, Social services, Promotion of volunteering

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities

Entity Structure

Habitat for Humanity Greater Auckland Limited is an incorporated limited liability company and a registered charitable entity. It has shareholders, directors and staff led by a General Manager. It operates charity shops known as ReStores as a means of helping to fund its operations.
Habitat for Humanity New Zealand Limited

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 - - - - To be filed
31/12/2019 28/11/2019 $4,516,595 $4,527,484
31/12/2018 10/10/2018 $3,972,510 $3,883,413
31/12/2017 7/12/2017 $3,819,656 $2,985,624
31/12/2016 20/12/2016 $2,634,074 $2,743,246
31/12/2015 1/12/2015 $3,584,070 $2,596,783
31/12/2014 29/01/2015 $3,726,681 $2,465,821
31/12/2013 10/12/2013 $2,527,285 $2,122,883
31/12/2012 17/12/2012 $2,730,749 $2,023,854
31/12/2011 19/12/2011 $3,109,654 $1,277,062

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Timothy Andrew Buchanan Director 8/11/2018
James Williamson Director 1/02/2017
Mark Berryman Director 1/02/2017
Natasha Sheree Harvey Director 1/02/2017
Conrad Roger LaPointe General Manager 1/10/2015
Luamanu Maea Director 16/06/2014
Lorene Lilian Neilson Accountant 8/05/2010
Uluomatootua Saulaulu Aiono Director 1/03/2009
Michael Mclean Director 14/02/2008
Georgina Elizabeth Wilkinson Director 3/10/2002

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
David Underwood Director 25/10/2018
Kenneth George Stevenson Director 7/09/2018
Martin Gerald Van Der Burg Director 10/08/2018
Leigh Alexander Auton Director 13/07/2018
Grant Lomax Cathro Director 19/12/2017
John Alexander Delugar Director 12/12/2016
Tracey Edith Stevenson Director 8/12/2015
Warren Graham Jack Executive Director 1/10/2015
Marguerite Christine Carter Director 30/01/2015
Peter Fuller Director 17/04/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
22/06/2017 NOC016
24/02/2015 NOC014
30/01/2015 NOC013
24/07/2014 NOC012
1/07/2014 NOC011
10/12/2013 NOC010
3/05/2013 NOC006
14/12/2012 AR005
28/08/2012 NOC004
23/12/2010 AR003

Charity Documents