pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Te Whenua Tōmuri Trust Board
CC54389
9429043255160
Registered

Registration details

9/03/2017
March 31

Address for service

6484A South Road
RD 35
Pungarehu
Opunake
4685

Charity's other details

Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/tewhenuatomuritrust


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Te Whenua Tōmuri Trust is committed to assist in sustainable community development and well-being in Taranaki and beyond; and to inspire and empower people to protect our communities and natural environment through sustainable techniques – Tiaki Taiao, promotion of kaitiakitanga.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Education / training / research

Community development

General public

Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

We are a charitable trust with currently five trustees: Emily Bailey, Marie Doorbar, Sera Gibson, Hinenui Wano-Bryant and Hoani Eriwata. We operate by our rules as set out in our Trust Deed.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 24/09/2019 $51,475 $56,033
30/09/2018 22/05/2018 $35,942 $26,659

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Hinenui Wano-Bryant Trustee 22/05/2018
Sera Gibson Trustee 22/05/2018
Hoani Eriwata Trustee 3/04/2016
Marie Doorbar Trustee 3/04/2016
Emily Bailey Trustee 12/07/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Urs Signer Trustee 21/02/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
8/04/2019 NOC004
28/05/2018 NOC003
23/05/2018 NOC002

Charity Documents