pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Trail Fund New Zealand Incorporated
CC48951
9429043319398
Registered

Registration details

26/03/2013
March 31

Address for service

157 Totara Road
Miramar
Wellington
6022

Charity's other details

021845991


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

People often say it’s worth taking the road less travelled, but they don’t often mention who builds it. In New Zealand, many trails worth taking are built thanks to the long hours put in by volunteers and those who support their efforts financially. However, taking a person or company’s desire to support trail building, and turning it into something concrete (or in this case, dirt) isn’t always the most straight forward process. This is why Trail Fund NZ was created. We are a not-for-profit organisation, run solely by volunteers, supporting the development and maintenance of publicly available, environmentally sensitive and sustainable mountain bike-accessible trails in New Zealand. Founded in 2012, Trail Fund NZ distributes grants to volunteer-led projects across the country. From Southland to Auckland, mountain bike clubs are getting help from Trail Fund NZ for the projects that are close to their heart and their homes.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Sport / recreation

Health, Environment / conservation, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities

Entity Structure

Incorporated society with charitable status. It is staffed entirely by volunteers. A management Committee consist of a chairperson, secretary, treasurer and 3- 4 general committee members with various responsibilities. An Advisory Board of 5-7 members reviews grant applications and recommends to the management committee which should be funded.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 14/09/2018 $46,657 $89,131
30/09/2017 1/10/2017 $64,517 $55,101
30/09/2016 29/09/2016 $122,722 $96,020
30/09/2015 8/09/2015 $211,550 $204,662
30/09/2014 21/10/2014 $54,051 $34,216
30/09/2013 30/09/2013 $0 $0

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Shanan Cohn Treasurer 1/10/2017
Russel Garlick Chairperson 10/09/2016
Nessa Lynch Secretary 22/01/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Bryan McConnell Treasurer 31/12/2017
Benjamin R Wilde Chairperson 10/09/2016
Jordan Moss Treasurer 1/08/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/05/2018 NOC004
30/09/2013 AR001

Charity Documents