pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Rings Beach Wetland Group Incorporated
CC57350
9429047523180
Registered

Registration details

27/11/2019
March 31

Address for service

8 Gray Avenue
RD 2
Kuaotunu West
Whitianga
3592

Charity's other details

0211740721
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/ringsbeachwetlandgroup


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Restoration and conservation of native flora and fauna in the Matarangi Bluff Scenic Reserve

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Environment / conservation

Education / training / research, Community development, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Entity Structure

Group of mainly local volunteers and supporters working cooperatively with DOC , TCDC, and WRC and others to achieve the groups objectives. Three elected officers Chair, Secretary and Treasurer, and a minimum of 5 person committee form the group structure

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 1/09/2021 $55,629 $46,202
30/09/2020 5/09/2020 $52,306 $52,059

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Dean Lendrum Committee Member 1/09/2020
Shirley Willey Committee Member 2/08/2020
Kathy Speirs Treasurer 20/11/2019
Caroline Parker Chairperson 9/05/2019
David Michael FitzGerald Secretary 9/05/2019
Ian Alister McDonald Patron 9/05/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jill Lenore Goodall Officer 1/08/2020

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents